Wiggins v. Stancil
Petitioner: Ronald Wiggins
Respondent: M.A. Stancil
Case Number: 1:2019cv01653
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Referring Judge: R Brooke Jackson
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2019 Filing 15 CASE REASSIGNED. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge R. Brooke Jackson. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-01653-RBJ. (Text Only Entry) (slibi, )
July 19, 2019 Filing 14 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Petitioner Ronald Wiggins. Parties do not consent. (tsher, )
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE that Respondent show cause within thirty (30) days from the date of this order why the application for a writ of habeas corpus should not be granted. It is further. That within thirty (30) days of Respondents answer to this show cause order, Applicant may file a Reply, if any. That the applicant shall remain in custody until further order, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 7/9/2019. (evana, )
July 9, 2019 Filing 12 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (evana, )
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DRAWING CASE by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 7/9/2019. This Case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter for all further proceedings. All Future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-1653 NRN. (evana, )
July 8, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE to #6 Order Preliminary Response to Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Respondent M.A. Stancil. (Steiner, Logan)
July 2, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Logan Ann Steiner on behalf of M.A. StancilAttorney Logan Ann Steiner added to party M.A. Stancil(pty:res) (Steiner, Logan)
July 1, 2019 Filing 8 RECEIPT for Certified Mail Green Card re: #7 Certificate of Service, #6 Order for Pre-Answer Response to the United States Attorney General, Washington D.C. received June 27,2019 (evana, )
June 20, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Service by Clerk of Court re #1 Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #6 Order to File Preliminary Response for Service of Process. (Attachments: #1 USPS Certified Mail Receipt) (rvill, )
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER to File Preliminary Response. Within twenty-one (21) days from the date of this Order Respondent shall file a Preliminary Response that complies with this Order, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 6/19/2019. (angar, )
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number COX090715 (agarc, )
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Directing Applicant to Cure Deficiencies. If Applicant fails to cure the designated deficiencies within thirty (30) days from the date of this order, the action will be dismissed without further notice. The dismissal shall be without prejudice, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 6/10/2019. (angar, )
June 7, 2019 Filing 3 LETTER re: $5.00 money order pre-mailed, by Petitioner Ronald Wiggins. (rvill, )
June 7, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 USC 2241, filed by M.A. Stancil.(rvill, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wiggins v. Stancil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: M.A. Stancil
Represented By: Logan Ann Steiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ronald Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?