Mathes v. Molson Coors Brewing Company et al
Plaintiff: Jacob Mathes
Defendant: Tracey I Joubert, Mark R Hunter and Molson Coors Brewing Company
Petitioner: Manhattan and Bronx Surface Transit Operating Authority Pension Plan, Iron Workers Local 580 Joint Funds, Metropolitan Transportation Authority Defined Benefit Public Plan Master Trust and Electrical Workers Pension Fund, Local 103 I.B.E.W.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01665
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: S Kato Crews
Nature of Suit: Securities, Commodities, Exchange
Cause of Action: 15:78
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2019 Filing 40 Civil Case Terminated pursuant to 39 Order Dismissing Case filed in this case on 7/26/2019. Text Only Entry. (agarc, )
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Plaintiff has filed a Notice of Voluntary Dismissal pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i). No Defendant has filed an Answer or Motion for Summary Judgment in this matter. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED that all claims brought in this matter were dismissed with prejudice as to Plaintiff only and without prejudice as to the putative class effective the date of filing, 7/25/2019. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall close this matter. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 7/26/2019. Text Only Entry (skclc2)
July 25, 2019 Filing 38 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case by Plaintiff Jacob Mathes (Guiney, Matthew)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER Setting Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference. The Scheduling Conference is set for 8/5/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. The parties shall file their proposed scheduling order, and email a copy in Word format to Crews_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, on or before 7/29/2019. The Magistrate Judge Consent Form (ECF. #36 ) is due 7/29/2019. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 6/12/2019. Text Only Entry (skclc2)
June 7, 2019 Filing 36 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (cmadr, )
June 7, 2019 Filing 35 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
June 7, 2019 Filing 34 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (cmadr, )
June 7, 2019 Filing 33 Case transferred in from District of Illinois Northern; Case Number 1:19-cv-01162. File, transfer order and docket sheet received. Modified to correct filing date on 6/10/2019 (cmadr, ).
June 7, 2019 Filing 32 TRANSFERRED to the Northern District of Colorado the electronic record. (gcy, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/10/2019.]
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 STIPULATION and ORDER Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 5/24/2019. Mailed notice(gcy, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/10/2019.]
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER: Pursuant to Stipulation and Order, the above-captioned litigation is transferred to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Colorado for consolidation with Segalis v. Molson Coors Brewing Company, et al., Case No. 1:19-cv-00455-DME-MEH (D. Colo.). Enter Stipulation and Order. Civil case terminated. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 5/24/2019. Mailed notice(gcy, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/10/2019.]
May 16, 2019 Filing 29 Notice of Non-Opposition by Mark R Hunter, Tracey I Joubert, Molson Coors Brewing Company (Jacobsen, Joni) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/10/2019.]
May 9, 2019 Filing 28 ATTORNEY Appearance for Movant Iron Workers Local 580 Joint Funds by Jeremy Alan Lieberman (Lieberman, Jeremy) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/10/2019.]
May 8, 2019 Filing 27 RESPONSE by Movant Iron Workers Local 580 Joint Funds to motion for miscellaneous relief, #18 Memorandum of Law (1) in Further Support of Motion of Iron Workers Local 580 Joint Funds for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Lead Counsel, and (2) in Opposition to Competing Motions (Lieberman, Jeremy) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/10/2019.]
May 8, 2019 Filing 26 MEMORANDUM of Law in Further Support of the Motion of the MTA Funds for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Selection of Counsel (Malmstrom, Carl) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/10/2019.]
May 7, 2019 Filing 25 RESPONSE by Electrical Workers Pension Fund, Local 103 I.B.E.W. (Local 103) to MOTION by Movant Iron Workers Local 580 Joint FundsFor Appointment As Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Lead Counsel #18 (Smith, Michael) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/10/2019.]
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER SETTING A BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR MOTIONS FOR APPOINTMENT OF LEAD PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFFS' SELECTION OF LEAD COUNSEL : Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 4/23/2019. Mailed notice. (etv, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/10/2019.]
April 22, 2019 Filing 23 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Motion hearing held on 4/22/2019. Motion of Iron Workers Local 580 Joint Funds #18 is entered and continued. Proposed order to be submitted. Mailed notice. (etv, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/10/2019.]
April 22, 2019 Filing 22 ATTORNEY Appearance for Movant Iron Workers Local 580 Joint Funds by Louis Carey Ludwig (Ludwig, Louis) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/10/2019.]
April 19, 2019 Filing 21 ATTORNEY Appearance for Movant Iron Workers Local 580 Joint Funds by J. Alexander Hood, II (Hood, J. Alexander) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/10/2019.]
April 17, 2019 Filing 20 ATTORNEY Appearance for Movants Manhattan and Bronx Surface Transit Operating Authority Pension Plan, Metropolitan Transportation Authority Defined Benefit Public Plan Master Trust by Carl V. Malmstrom (Malmstrom, Carl) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/10/2019.]
April 16, 2019 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM by Iron Workers Local 580 Joint Funds in support of motion for miscellaneous relief, #18 For Appoinment As Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Lead Counsel (Lieberman, Jeremy) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/10/2019.]
April 16, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION by Movant Iron Workers Local 580 Joint FundsFor Appointment As Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Lead Counsel (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Jeremy A. Lieberman in Support of Motion, #3 Exhibit A - PSLRA Notice, #4 Exhibit B - Certification, #5 Exhibit C - Loss Chart, #6 Exhibit D - Firm Resume)(Lieberman, Jeremy) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/10/2019.]
April 16, 2019 Filing 17 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Electrical Workers Pension Fund, Local 103 I.B.E.W. (Local 103) (Smith, Michael) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/10/2019.]
April 16, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Motion by Jeremy Alan Lieberman for presentment of before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 4/22/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Lieberman, Jeremy) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/10/2019.]
April 16, 2019 Filing 15 ATTORNEY Appearance for Movant Electrical Workers Pension Fund, Local 103 I.B.E.W. (Local 103) Michael D Smith (Smith, Michael) (Docket text modified by Clerk's Office on 4/17/2019) (nsf, ). [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/10/2019.]
April 16, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE by Electrical Workers Pension Fund, Local 103 I.B.E.W. (Local 103) of Motion to Transfer and Consolidate and for Appointment of Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Smith, Michael). (Docket text modified by the Clerk's Office) Modified on 4/17/2019 (mc, ). [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/10/2019.]
April 16, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Motion by Carl V. Malmstrom for presentment of before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 4/30/2019 at 08:45 AM. (Malmstrom, Carl) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/10/2019.]
April 16, 2019 Filing 12 DECLARATION of Matthew M. Guiney regarding memorandum in support of motion #11 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Malmstrom, Carl) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/10/2019.]
April 16, 2019 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM of Law in Support of the Motion of the MTA Funds for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Selection of Counsel (Malmstrom, Carl) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/10/2019.]
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY STAY AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE: Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 4/15/2019. Mailed notice. (etv, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/10/2019.]
April 15, 2019 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Joint motion regarding discovery stay and briefing schedule #7 is granted without an appearance. Initial status hearing set for 4/18/2019 is stricken and re-set to 6/18/2019 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice. (etv, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/10/2019.]
April 12, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Motion by Joni S. Jacobsen for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #7 before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 4/16/2019 at 08:45 AM. (Jacobsen, Joni) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/10/2019.]
April 12, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION by Defendants Mark R Hunter, Tracey I Joubert, Molson Coors Brewing Company Regarding Discovery Stay and Briefing Schedule (JOINT) (Jacobsen, Joni) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/10/2019.]
April 12, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Mark R Hunter, Tracey I Joubert, Molson Coors Brewing Company by Angela M. Liu (Liu, Angela) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/10/2019.]
April 12, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Mark R Hunter, Tracey I Joubert, Molson Coors Brewing Company by Joni S. Jacobsen (Jacobsen, Joni) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/10/2019.]
April 12, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Mark R Hunter, Tracey I Joubert, Molson Coors Brewing Company by David H. Kistenbroker (Kistenbroker, David) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/10/2019.]
February 20, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Mark R Hunter, Tracey I Joubert, Molson Coors Brewing Company (pj, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/10/2019.]
February 19, 2019 Filing 3 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Initial status hearing set for 4/18/2019 at 09:00 AM, courtroom 2141. Mailed notice. (etv, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/10/2019.]
February 15, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable M. David Weisman. Case assignment: Random assignment. (lma, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/10/2019.]
February 15, 2019 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jacob Mathes by Carl V. Malmstrom (Malmstrom, Carl) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/10/2019.]
February 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Class Action Complaint for Violations of the Federal Securities Laws filed by Jacob Mathes; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15491789. (Attachments: #1 Errata A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Malmstrom, Carl)[Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/10/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mathes v. Molson Coors Brewing Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob Mathes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracey I Joubert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark R Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Molson Coors Brewing Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Manhattan and Bronx Surface Transit Operating Authority Pension Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Iron Workers Local 580 Joint Funds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Metropolitan Transportation Authority Defined Benefit Public Plan Master Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Electrical Workers Pension Fund, Local 103 I.B.E.W.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?