McCasland et al v. Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Terrell McCasland and Christine McCasland
Defendant: Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv01674
Filed: June 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Robert E Blackburn
Referring Judge: Scott T Varholak
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Filing 13 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company All parties do not consent.. (Wagner, Rebecca)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER Per the request of the parties, the Scheduling Conference set for 8/15/2019 09:00 AM is VACATED and RESET for 8/30/2019 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. On or before 8/23/2019, the parties shall submit a joint proposed scheduling order. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 8/02/2019. Text Only Entry (stvlc1, )
June 17, 2019 Filing 11 Defendant Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company's ANSWER to #4 Complaint and Jury Demand by Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company.(Bell, Devon)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 8/15/2019 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 6/12/2019. (jgonz, )
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. IT IS ORDERED that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this matter is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge:(1) To convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b), enter a Scheduling Order that satisfies the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, and enter such orders as appropriate to enforce the Scheduling order and resolve discovery matters; provided, further that the scheduling conference, the Magistrate Judge shall advise the parties of Judge Blackburns practice standards found at www.cod.uscourts.gov.;(2) To hear and finally determine non-dispositive matters that have been referred, subject to the exceptions found in 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A); and(3) To hear and make recommendations on dispositive matters that have been referred as defined in 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLOLCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 6/11/19. Text Only Entry (rebsec)
June 10, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Patricia A. Meester on behalf of Christine McCasland, Terrell McCaslandAttorney Patricia A. Meester added to party Christine McCasland(pty:pla), Attorney Patricia A. Meester added to party Terrell McCasland(pty:pla) (Meester, Patricia)
June 10, 2019 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (rvill, )
June 10, 2019 Filing 6 Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
June 10, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Summons and Complaint upon Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company on 05/20/2019. (rvill, )
June 10, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company, filed by Terrell McCasland and Christine McCasland.(rvill, )
June 10, 2019 Filing 3 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (rvill, )
June 10, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Devon D. A. Bell on behalf of Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance CompanyAttorney Devon D. A. Bell added to party Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Bell, Devon)
June 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company from Denver District Court, Case Number 2019CV31650. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-6733859), filed by Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit A-State Court Civil Case Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A-State Court Summons, #4 Exhibit A-State Court Pre-Trial Order, #5 Exhibit A-State Court Delay Reduction Order, #6 Exhibit A-State Court Affidavit of Service, #7 Exhibit A-State Court Affidavit of Service (2nd), #8 Exhibit A-State Court Notice of Withdrawal of Affidavit of Service, #9 Exhibit B-Medical Record (Terrell McCasland), #10 Exhibit C-Medical Record (Christine McCasland), #11 Exhibit D-Allstate Corporation File Detail Report, #12 State Court Register of Actions, #13 Disclosure Statement, #14 Civil Cover Sheet, #15 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet)(Wagner, Rebecca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCasland et al v. Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrell McCasland
Represented By: Patricia A. Meester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine McCasland
Represented By: Patricia A. Meester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Rebecca Kirsten Wagner
Represented By: Devon D. A. Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?