Wallace v. Paypal et al
Plaintiff: Brian William Wallace
Defendant: Dan Schulman and PayPal
Case Number: 1:2019cv01695
Filed: June 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Philip A Brimmer
Referring Judge: Raymond P Moore
2 Judge: Nina Y Wang
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE of Service by Mail by Clerk of Court re #22 Minute Order, to Brian William Wallace, 5994 South Holly Street, #244, Denver, CO 80111. Text Only Entry (nmarb, )
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 7/10/19. Status Conference set for 7/23/19 at 10:30 AM is VACATED and RESET to 9/4/2019 01:30 PM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. A copy of this Minute Order shall be sent to: Brian William Wallace, 5994 South Holly Street, #244, Denver, CO 80111. (nmarb, )
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER: With the assignment of this matter, the parties are advised that throughout this case they are expected to be familiar and comply with not only the Local Rules of this District, but also Judge Raymond P. Moore's Civil Practice Standards, which may be found at: http://www.cod.uscourts.gov/JudicialOfficers/ActiveArticleIIIJudges/HonRaymondPMoore.aspx Entered by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 7/8/2019. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order, and (5) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. Entered by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 7/8/2019. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
July 2, 2019 Filing 19 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #18 Order. This case is directly reassigned to Judge Raymond P. Moore. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-01695-RM-NYW. (Text Only Entry). (sphil, )
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 7/2/2019. ORDERED that, pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(d)(1), the Clerk of the Court shall transfer this case to Judge Raymond P. Moore. (sphil, )
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Leave by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 6/25/2019. Plaintiff may appear telephonically at the 7/23/2019 Status Conference by call chambers at 303.335.2600 at the designated time. Text Only Entry(nywlc2, )
June 24, 2019 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM regarding #14 MOTION for Leave to Appear at Status Conference Via Telephone filed by Brian William Wallace. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 6/24/19. Text Only Entry (pabsec)
June 21, 2019 Filing 15 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Brian William Wallace. All parties do not consent. (sphil, )
June 21, 2019 Filing 14 Plaintiff Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear at Status Conference Via Telephone and [Proposed} Order, by Plaintiff Brian William Wallace. (sphil, )
June 21, 2019 Filing 13 Plaintiffs RESPONSE to #10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff Brian William Wallace. (sphil, )
June 19, 2019 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM regarding #10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by PayPal, Dan Schulman. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 6/19/19. Text Only Entry (pabsec)
June 18, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF CASE ASSOCIATION by Jamie H. Steiner on behalf of PayPal, Dan Schulman (Steiner, Jamie)
June 18, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants PayPal, Dan Schulman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Private Action Claim [State Court Action])(Steiner, Jamie)
June 13, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Service by Mail by Clerk of Court re #8 Minute Order, to Brian William Wallace, 5994 South Holly Street, #244, Denver, CO 80111. Text Only Entry (nmarb, )
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 6/13/19. Status Conference set for 7/23/2019 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a copy of this Order is to be sent to the following: Brian William Wallace, 5994 South Holly Street #244, Denver, CO 80111. Text Only Entry (nmarb, )
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang for all motions. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order, and (5) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. By Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 6/13/19. Text Only Entry (pabsec)
June 11, 2019 Filing 24 PRIVATE ACTION CLAIM against PayPal, and Dan Schulman, filed by Brian William Wallace.(rvill, )
June 11, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendants PayPal, Dan Schulman (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B to Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit B to Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit B to Notice of Removal, #4 Exhibit B to Notice of Removal)(Steiner, Jamie)
June 11, 2019 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (rvill, )
June 11, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer and drawn to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
June 11, 2019 Filing 3 Administrative Notice: Notice to filer of non-compliance with Notice of Removal case opening procedures. It is the responsibility of the attorney removing the case to follow Local Rule D.C.COLO.LCivR 81.1, and 28 U.S.C. 1446(a). See Appendix B Notice of Removal, in the User Guide - Attorney Case Opening Procedures document - Each of the state court documentsshall be individual PDFs. (Text Only Entry) (rvill, )
June 11, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent PayPal Holdings, Inc. for Paypal, Inc.. (Steiner, Jamie)
June 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Dan Schulman, Paypal, Inc. from Denver District Court, Case Number 2019CV267. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-6736033), filed by Dan Schulman, Paypal, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - statet court docket sheet, #2 Exhibit B - pleadings and orders from state court action, #3 Exhibit C - CO Sec of State Business Entity Detail for PayPal, Inc., #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Steiner, Jamie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wallace v. Paypal et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian William Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Schulman
Represented By: Jamie H. Steiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PayPal
Represented By: Jamie H. Steiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?