Federated Mutual Insurance Company v. Tenney et al
Plaintiff: Federated Mutual Insurance Company
Defendant: Samuel Jesse Spencer, III, England Fence Company, LLC and Sidney Tenney
Case Number: 1:2019cv01697
Filed: June 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Lewis T Babcock
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Federated Mutual Insurance Company. Sidney Tenney served on 7/22/2019, answer due 8/12/2019. (Swift, Jeremy)
July 16, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (athom, )
July 15, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Sidney Tenney re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Federated Mutual Insurance Company. (Swift, Jeremy)
July 15, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Federated Mutual Insurance Company. Samuel Jesse Spencer, III waiver sent on 7/15/2019, answer due 9/13/2019. (Swift, Jeremy)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re: #5 Stipulation for Dismissal. This matter shall be dismissed without prejudice as to Defendant England Fence Company, LLC only, each party to pay their own fees and costs, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 7/10/2019. (ebuch)
July 9, 2019 Filing 5 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Party Without Prejudice of England Fence Company, LLC by Plaintiff Federated Mutual Insurance Company. (Swift, Jeremy)
June 11, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jeremy Love Swift on behalf of Federated Mutual Insurance CompanyAttorney Jeremy Love Swift added to party Federated Mutual Insurance Company(pty:pla) (Swift, Jeremy)
June 11, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). No Summons Issued. (cmadr, )
June 11, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock and drawn to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry (cmadr, )
June 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6736114)Attorney Kathleen Lynn Beiermeister added to party Federated Mutual Insurance Company(pty:pla), filed by Federated Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #2 Notice of Related Cases, #3 Notice of Appearance for Thomas H. Crouch, #4 Notice of Appearance for Kathleen Beiermeister, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Beiermeister, Kathleen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Federated Mutual Insurance Company v. Tenney et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federated Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Kathleen Lynn Beiermeister
Represented By: Jeremy Love Swift
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel Jesse Spencer, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: England Fence Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sidney Tenney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?