Dean-Lee v. California Casualty Indemnity Exchange
Plaintiff: Kathi Dean-Lee
Defendant: California Casualty Indemnity Exchange
Case Number: 1:2019cv01699
Filed: June 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Christine M Arguello
Referring Judge: Lewis T Babcock
2 Judge: Kristen L Mix
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STIPULATED ORDER, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 8/1/19. (morti, )
August 1, 2019 Filing 24 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES:re: #23 Stipulation filed by attorney William Finger. Attorney has used an incorrect signature format in violation of D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(a) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures. Address, Phone and Fax Numbers, e-mail address are missing. (Civil cases). DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. (Text Only Entry) (evana, )
August 1, 2019 Filing 23 STIPULATED Order by Federal Rule of Evidence 502(d). by Plaintiff Kathi Dean-Lee. (Finger, William) (Modified on 8/1/2019 edited to add the text 502(d))(evana, ).
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 7/31/19. (lgale, )
July 31, 2019 Filing 21 MINUTE ENTRY for Scheduling Conference held before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 7/31/2019. Discovery due by 4/3/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 5/18/2020. Status Report due by 5/1/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/28/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom A401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. FTR: KLM Courtroom A401. (Attachments: #1 Discovery Procedures and Requirements of Practice) (lgale, )
July 25, 2019 Filing 20 Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Kathi Dean-Lee. (Finger, William)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 7/24/19 GRANTING #17 Motion for Extension of Time to File Proposed Scheduling Order. Proposed Scheduling Order due on or before 7/25/2019.(nmarb, )
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MEMORANDUM regarding #17 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Proposed Scheduling Order. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 7/23/2019. Text Only Entry (cmalc3)
July 23, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Kathi Dean-Lee. (Finger, William)
July 8, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Steven Ross Helling on behalf of California Casualty Indemnity ExchangeAttorney Steven Ross Helling added to party California Casualty Indemnity Exchange(pty:dft) (Helling, Steven)
July 5, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE re #14 Notice of CONSTITUTIONAL QUESTION of C.R.S. 10-3-1115 and 10-3-1116, and by Article II, Section 25 of the Colorado Constitution. (evana, )
July 2, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF CONSTITUTIONAL QUESTION by Defendant California Casualty Indemnity Exchange (Dewhirst, Miles)
July 2, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by William Sidney Finger on behalf of Kathi Dean-LeeAttorney William Sidney Finger added to party Kathi Dean-Lee(pty:pla) (Finger, William)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 6/25/19. Scheduling Conference set for 7/31/2019 9:30 AM in Courtroom A401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2, #3 Attachment 3) (lgale, )
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b). The parties should expect to be given a firm trial setting that is 90 to 120 days from the date of the final pretrial conference, and should be available for trial accordingly. FURTHER, Court-sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the Court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 6/12/2019. Text Only Entry (cmalc3)
June 12, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by California Casualty Indemnity Exchange.(Dewhirst, Miles)
June 12, 2019 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Senior Judge Babcock. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Christine M. Arguello. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-01699-CMA. (athom, )
June 12, 2019 Filing 8 STATE COURT RECORDS from Denver County District Court Case 2019CV32023 by Defendant California Casualty Indemnity Exchange. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet State Court Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Complaint and Jury Demand, #3 State Court Delay Reduction Order, #4 State Court Pretrial Order, #5 State Court Summons, #6 State Court Return of Service)(Dewhirst, Miles)
June 11, 2019 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (cmadr, )
June 11, 2019 Filing 6 Case assigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
June 11, 2019 Filing 5 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (cmadr, )
June 11, 2019 Filing 4 Administrative Notice: Notice to filer of non-compliance with Notice of Removal case opening procedures. It is the responsibility of the attorney or pro se party removing the case to follow Local Rule D.C.COLO.LCivR 81.1, and 28 U.S.C. 1446(a). Each of the state court documents shall be individual PDFs. See Appendix B Notice of Removal, in the User Guide - Attorney Case Opening Procedures document. (Text Only Entry) (cmadr, )
June 11, 2019 Filing 3 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: Miles Milton Dewhirst.The document was scanned and not converted directly to portable document format (PDF). DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 1.3(f) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). (Text Only Entry) (cmadr, )
June 11, 2019 Filing 2 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES:Miles Milton Dewhirst.Attorney or pro se has used an incorrect signature format in violation of D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(a) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. In the future, the filer must affix an electronic s/signature and s/followed by a typed, not an inked, signature to all future documents.(Text Only Entry) (cmadr, )
June 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by California Casualty Indemnity Exchange from City and County of Denver District Court, Case Number 2019CV32023. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-6736162), filed by California Casualty Indemnity Exchange. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Dewhirst, Miles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dean-Lee v. California Casualty Indemnity Exchange
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Casualty Indemnity Exchange
Represented By: Miles Milton Dewhirst
Represented By: Steven Ross Helling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathi Dean-Lee
Represented By: William Sidney Finger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?