Morries v. Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Patrick C. Morries
Defendant: Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Interested Party: USAO-SS-Noticing and SSA Noticing
Case Number: 1:2019cv01815
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Robert E Blackburn
Referring Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g))
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REGARDING INSTRUCTIONS FOR JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 08/07/2019. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Form) (athom, )
August 5, 2019 Filing 11 Utility Setting Deadlines: Commissioner, Social Security Administration answer due 10/4/2019. Text Only Entry (athom, )
August 5, 2019 Filing 10 Administrative Notice: Social Security Case Service. Pursuant to the Letter of Agreement signed by the Clerk, U.S. District Court;U.S. Attorneys Office for the District of Colorado (USAO), and Social Security Administration (SSA), service of the initiating document(s) by the plaintiff to the SSA, the U.S. Attorney General, and USAO in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(i) is not necessary unless the court otherwise orders. A summons is not required and will not be issued. (Text Only Entry) (cmadr, )
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Drawing Case, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 8/5/2019. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-1815-REB (angar, )
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER that the Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Long Form) (ECF No. #7 ) is GRANTED, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 8/5/2019.(evana, )
July 29, 2019 Filing 7 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs, by Plaintiff Patrick C. Morries. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (athom, )
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SECOND ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiencies. If Plaintiff fails to cure all of the designated deficiencies within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order, the action will be dismissed without further notice. The dismissal shall be without prejudice. ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is directed to mail to Plaintiff, with a copy of this Order, one blank copy of the current Court-approved form Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Long Form) and applicable instructions, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 7/29/2019. (forms mailed as ordered). (sphil, )
July 22, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by J. Benedict Garcia on behalf of Commissioner, Social Security AdministrationAttorney J. Benedict Garcia added to party Commissioner, Social Security Administration(pty:dft) (Garcia, J.)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiencies. If Plaintiff fails to cure the designated deficiencies within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order, the action will be dismissed without further notice. The dismissal shall be without prejudice. The Motion to File Without Payment of Filing Fee (ECF No. #3 ) is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE as on the incorrect form, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 6/24/2019. (angar, )
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 Motion to File Without Payment of Filing Fee by Plaintiff Patrick C. Morries. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(rsams, ) Modified on 7/30/2019 to terminate motion pursuant to #4 Order (angar, ).
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (rsams, )
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Judicial Review of Social Security Decision against Commissioner, Social Security Administration, filed by Patrick C. Morries. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(rsams, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morries v. Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: USAO-SS-Noticing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Noticing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Represented By: J. Benedict Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick C. Morries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?