Tripwireless Inc. v. Borrego
Plaintiff: Tripwireless Inc.
Defendant: Hector Borrego
Case Number: 1:2019cv01819
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Kristen L Mix
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Hector Borrego. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(nmarb, )
July 26, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of Service by Mail by Clerk of Court re #13 Certificate of Service to Hector Borrego, 2484 Fernwood Drive, Ventura, CA 93001. Text Only Entry. (agarc, )
July 25, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of Service re #9 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge, and #10 Uncontested MOTION for Date Extension for Rule 12 by Defendant Hector Borrego. (agarc, )
July 25, 2019 Hector Borrego answer due 8/12/2019 pursuant to #11 . (lgale, )
July 22, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of Mailing/Service re #11 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File, by Plaintiff Tripwireless Inc.. (Nitta, Chad)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 7/22/19. Uncontested Motion for Date Extension for Rule 12 #10 is GRANTED. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint and Jury Demand #1 on or before August 12, 2019. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1)(lgale, )
July 19, 2019 Filing 10 Uncontested MOTION for Date Extension for Rule 12, by Defendant Hector Borrego. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(nmarb, )
July 19, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Hector Borrego. Defendant only consents. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(nmarb, )
July 9, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Mailing/Service re 6 Minute Order, #7 Order, by Plaintiff Tripwireless Inc.. (Nitta, Chad)
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 7/5/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 10/9/2019 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. (Attachments: #1 Continuation of Main Document, #2 Continuation of Main Document) (tsher, )
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER. Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(c)(4), the deadline to file the Consent/Non-Consent to United States Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form [#4-1] is September 25, 2019. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 7/5/2019. Text Only Entry (klmlc1, )
July 2, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tripwireless Inc.. Hector Borrego served on 6/29/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (Nitta, Chad)
June 24, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (cmadr, )
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Field, Elizabeth)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Hector Borrego (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6756375)Attorney Chad Takashi Nitta added to party Tripwireless Inc.(pty:pla), filed by Tripwireless Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Nitta, Chad)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tripwireless Inc. v. Borrego
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hector Borrego
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tripwireless Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth Julianne Field
Represented By: Chad Takashi Nitta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?