Guzman v. USA
Petitioner: David Anthony Guzman
Respondent: USA
Case Number: 1:2019cv01844
Filed: June 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Lewis T Babcock
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 18:0983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Petitioner's Motion to Withdraw Motion for Order to Set Aside Administrative Forfeiture #1 . This matter shall be closed. Each party to pay their own fees and costs, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 7/18/2019. (ebuch)
July 17, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Withdraw #1 MOTION to Set Aside Forfeiture by Petitioner David Anthony Guzman. (Saint-Veltri, Joseph)
July 3, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE re #1 MOTION to Set Aside Forfeiture Civil Cover Sheet by Petitioner David Anthony Guzman (Saint-Veltri, Joseph)
June 25, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (rvill, )
June 25, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock and drawn to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
June 25, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS REQUEST as to United States of America re #1 Petition/Application, by Plaintiff David Anthony Guzman. (Saint-Veltri, Joseph)
June 25, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Joseph Saint-Veltri on behalf of David Anthony Guzman (Saint-Veltri, Joseph)
June 25, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION TO SET ASIDE ADMINISTRATIVE FORFEITURE PURSUANT TO 18 U.S.C. 983(e)(1) (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-6761040)Attorney Joseph Saint-Veltri added to party David Anthony Guzman(pty:pla), filed by David Anthony Guzman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Notices)(Saint-Veltri, Joseph) Modified on 6/25/2019 to correct event (angar, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guzman v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: David Anthony Guzman
Represented By: Joseph Saint-Veltri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?