Estate of C.J. Marsh, The v. Marsh
Plaintiff: Estate C.J. Marsh and Estate of C.J. Marsh, The
Defendant: Peter L Marsh
Case Number: 1:2019cv01908
Filed: July 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Lewis T Babcock
Referring Judge: Scott T Varholak
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 8/27/2019. (ebuch)
August 1, 2019 Filing 9 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES:re: #7 Answer to Complaint filed by attorney Mitchell Dean Smith.Attorney or pro se has used an incorrect signature format in violation of D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(a) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. In the future, the filer must affix an electronic s/signature and s/followed by a typed, not an inked, signature to all future documents.(Text Only Entry) (angar, )
July 31, 2019 Filing 8 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES:re: #6 Notice of Entry of Appearance filed by attorney Mitchell Dean Smith.Attorney or pro se has used an incorrect signature format in violation of D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(a) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. In the future, the filer must affix an electronic s/signature and s/followed by a typed, not an inked, signature to all future documents.(Text Only Entry) (angar, )
July 31, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Peter L Marsh.(Smith, Mitchell)
July 31, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Mitchell Dean Smith on behalf of Peter L MarshAttorney Mitchell Dean Smith added to party Peter L Marsh(pty:dft) (Smith, Mitchell)
July 19, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Estate of C.J. Marsh, The. Peter L Marsh served on 7/10/2019, answer due 7/31/2019. (Bohn, Michael)
July 2, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (rvill, )
July 1, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock and drawn to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
July 1, 2019 Filing 2 Administrative Notice: Duplicate filing fee received. Financial notified and a refund is pending. (Text Only Entry) (rvill, )
July 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Peter L Marsh (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6770034)Attorney Michael Gerard Bohn added to party C.J. Marsh(pty:pla), filed by The Estate of C.J. Marsh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 Letters of PR, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2 Promissory Note, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons)(Bohn, Michael) Modified to correct text entry on 7/2/2019 (rvill, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Estate of C.J. Marsh, The v. Marsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate C.J. Marsh
Represented By: Michael Gerard Bohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of C.J. Marsh, The
Represented By: Michael Gerard Bohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter L Marsh
Represented By: Mitchell Dean Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?