Rios-Bamac v. Lynch et al
Defendant: Act DHS Sec. Kevin MCALEENAN, William P. BARR and James McHenry
Petitioner: Brenda Karina RIOS-BAMAC
Respondent: Johnny Choate, Jeffrey D. Lynch, Mark A MORGAN, Christopher L. JONES, Mark A. Morgan and Kevin K. McAleenan
Case Number: 1:2019cv01939
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Nina Y Wang
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241in
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Filing the Amended Petition by Petitioner Brenda Karina Rios-Bamac (Butterfield, Edain)
August 26, 2019 Filing 19 AMENDED APPLICATION for Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241 , filed by Brenda Karina Rios-Bamac. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Petitioner's Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Petitioner's Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Petitioner's Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Petitioner's Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Petitioner's Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Petitioner's Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Petitioner's Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit Petitioner's Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit Petitioner's Exhibit 9)(Butterfield, Edain)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 8/12/2019. Ms. Rios-Bamac may file an amended petition for writ of habeas corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241 on or before August 26, 2019. Further, the Show Cause response deadline set for August 13 and the Show Cause Hearing set for August 16, 2019 are VACATED. Text Only Entry(nywlc2, )
August 9, 2019 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Petitioner Brenda Karina Rios-Bamac. (Butterfield, Edain)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER OF REFERENCE. Pursuant to the consent of the parties to the jurisdiction of the magistrate judge #15 , this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang for all purposes pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 8/7/19. Text Only Entry (pabsec)
August 6, 2019 Filing 15 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Petitioner Brenda Karina Rios-Bamac All parties consent.. (Butterfield, Edain)
August 5, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kyle W. Brenton on behalf of William P. Barr, Johnny Choate, Christopher L. Jones, Jeffrey D. Lynch, Kevin K. McAleenan, James McHenry, Mark A. MorganAttorney Kyle W. Brenton added to party William P. Barr(pty:res), Attorney Kyle W. Brenton added to party Johnny Choate(pty:res), Attorney Kyle W. Brenton added to party Christopher L. Jones(pty:res), Attorney Kyle W. Brenton added to party Jeffrey D. Lynch(pty:res), Attorney Kyle W. Brenton added to party Kevin K. McAleenan(pty:res), Attorney Kyle W. Brenton added to party James McHenry(pty:res), Attorney Kyle W. Brenton added to party Mark A. Morgan(pty:res) (Brenton, Kyle)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER resetting the Consent/Non-Consent Form deadline to 8/6/2019 by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 8/1/2019. Text Only Entry (nywlc2, )
July 25, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of Service resent by E-Mail by Clerk of Court re #9 Order to Show Cause, and #1 Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus, to usaco.ecfcivil@usdoj.gov,. (incorrect email address used in entry 11 .) Text Only Entry (nmarb, )
July 23, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of Service by E-Mail by Clerk of Court re #9 Order to Show Cause, and #1 Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus, to usaco.ecfcivil@us.doj.gov,. Text Only Entry (nmarb, )
July 23, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of Service by Mail by Clerk of Court re #9 Order to Show Cause, and #1 Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus, to: Jeffrey D. Lynch, Christopher L. Jones, Mark A. Morgan, James McHenry, Kevin K. McAleenan, William P. Barr, Esq., and Johnny Choate, at the addresses listed in entry #8 in this matter. Text Only Entry (nmarb, )
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 7/23/19 returnable by Respondents as to why the Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241 should not be granted. Show Cause Hearing set for 8/16/2019 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Show Cause Response due by 8/13/2019. Consent form deadline is 7/31/19. If the parties do not consent, the Motion Hearing will be automatically vacated. The Clerk of the Court shall send a copy of the Application [#1] and this Order to Show Cause to Respondents, as well as a courtesy copy via email to the United States Attorneys Office for the District of Colorado. (nmarb, ) .
July 11, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONSES issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (nmarb, )
July 9, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Jeffrey D Lynch, Christopher L Jones, Johnny Choate, Mark A Morgan, Kevin K McAleenan, James McHenry, William P Barr by Petitioner Brenda Karina Rios-Bamac. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons Christopher L Jones, #2 Summons Summons Mark A Morgan, #3 Summons Summons James McHenry, #4 Summons Summons Kevin K McAleenan, #5 Summons Summons William P Barr, #6 Summons Summons Johnny Choate)(Butterfield, Edain)
July 8, 2019 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (rvill, )
July 8, 2019 Filing 5 CASE REASSIGNED. This case was drawn in error. This case has been randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-01939-NYW. (Text Only Entry) (rvill, )
July 5, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
July 5, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number COX090970. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
July 5, 2019 Filing 2 Administrative Notice: No filing fee received with case opening. Attorney contacted with instructions to submit filing fee within 3 hours. (Text Only Entry) (rroge, )
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 USC 2241 (Filing fee $ 5)Attorney Edain Rose Butterfield added to party Brenda Karina RIOS-BAMAC(pty:pet), filed by Brenda Karina RIOS-BAMAC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Petitioner's Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Petitioner's Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Petitioner's Exhibit 3)(Butterfield, Edain)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rios-Bamac v. Lynch et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Act DHS Sec. Kevin MCALEENAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William P. BARR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James McHenry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Johnny Choate
Represented By: Kyle W. Brenton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jeffrey D. Lynch
Represented By: Kyle W. Brenton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Mark A MORGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Christopher L. JONES
Represented By: Kyle W. Brenton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Mark A. Morgan
Represented By: Kyle W. Brenton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kevin K. McAleenan
Represented By: Kyle W. Brenton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Brenda Karina RIOS-BAMAC
Represented By: Edain Rose Butterfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?