Lystn, LLCv. Food and Drug Administration et al
Plaintiff: Lystn, LLC and Lystn, LLC doing business as Answers Pet Food
Defendant: Colorado Department of Agriculture, Food and Drug Administration, Laurel (I) Hamling, Kate Greenberg, Laurel Hamling, Scott (I) Ziehr, Scott Ziehr, United States Department of Health and Human Services, Association of American Feed Control Officials and Kate (I) Greenberg
Case Number: 1:2019cv01943
Filed: July 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Robert E Blackburn
Referring Judge: Philip A Brimmer
2 Judge: Kristen L Mix
Nature of Suit: APA Review/Appeal
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Filing 62 First MOTION for Discovery PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR DISCOVERY IN AID OF JURISDICTION by Plaintiff Lystn, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A - H, #2 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(O'Keefe, Joseph)
August 16, 2019 Filing 61 RESPONSE to #12 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction PLAINTIFFS COMBINED MOTION AND MEMORANDUM FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 65(a)(2) - Interim Response filed by Defendant Association of American Feed Control Officials. (Guillon, Stacy)
August 15, 2019 Filing 60 RESPONSE to #12 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction PLAINTIFFS COMBINED MOTION AND MEMORANDUM FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 65(a)(2) filed by Defendants Colorado Department of Agriculture, Kate Greenberg, Kate (I) Greenberg, Laurel Hamling, Laurel (I) Hamling, Scott Ziehr, Scott (I) Ziehr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Knapton, Lindsey)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 08/15/19 GRANTING #56 Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Consolidate Deadlines. Colorado Department of Agriculture answer due 9/10/2019; Kate Greenberg answer due 9/10/2019; Kate (I) Greenberg answer due 9/10/2019; Laurel Hamling answer due 9/10/2019; Laurel (I) Hamling answer due 9/10/2019; Scott Ziehr answer due 9/10/2019; Scott (I) Ziehr answer due 9/10/2019.(nmarb, )
August 14, 2019 Filing 58 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendant Association of American Feed Control Officials. Association of American Feed Control Officials answer due 9/4/2019. (Guillon, Stacy)
August 13, 2019 Filing 57 MEMORANDUM regarding #56 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond - Motion to Consolidate Deadlines filed by Colorado Department of Agriculture, Laurel (I) Hamling, Kate (I) Greenberg, Scott Ziehr, Laurel Hamling, Kate Greenberg, Scott (I) Ziehr. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 8/13/19. Text Only Entry (pabsec)
August 12, 2019 Filing 56 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond - Motion to Consolidate Deadlines by Defendants Colorado Department of Agriculture, Kate Greenberg, Kate (I) Greenberg, Laurel Hamling, Laurel (I) Hamling, Scott Ziehr, Scott (I) Ziehr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Knapton, Lindsey)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 55 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 8/9/19 GRANTING #45 Motion for Hearing/Conference. Status Conference set for 10/16/2019 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Courts July 8, 2019 Order [#37], directing the parties to file a proposed Joint Case Management Plan pursuant to D.C.COLO.LAPR 16.1(a), is VACATED.(nmarb, )
August 6, 2019 Filing 54 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Lindsey Marie Knapton on behalf of Colorado Department of Agriculture, Kate Greenberg, Kate (I) Greenberg, Laurel Hamling, Laurel (I) Hamling, Scott Ziehr, Scott (I) ZiehrAttorney Lindsey Marie Knapton added to party Colorado Department of Agriculture(pty:dft), Attorney Lindsey Marie Knapton added to party Kate Greenberg(pty:dft), Attorney Lindsey Marie Knapton added to party Kate (I) Greenberg(pty:dft), Attorney Lindsey Marie Knapton added to party Laurel Hamling(pty:dft), Attorney Lindsey Marie Knapton added to party Laurel (I) Hamling(pty:dft), Attorney Lindsey Marie Knapton added to party Scott Ziehr(pty:dft), Attorney Lindsey Marie Knapton added to party Scott (I) Ziehr(pty:dft) (Knapton, Lindsey)
August 6, 2019 Filing 53 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Stacy Kourlis Guillon on behalf of Association of American Feed Control OfficialsAttorney Stacy Kourlis Guillon added to party Association of American Feed Control Officials(pty:dft) (Guillon, Stacy)
August 6, 2019 Filing 52 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kenneth F. Rossman, IV on behalf of Association of American Feed Control OfficialsAttorney Kenneth F. Rossman, IV added to party Association of American Feed Control Officials(pty:dft) (Rossman, Kenneth)
August 6, 2019 Filing 51 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by John Garfield Dillard on behalf of Association of American Feed Control OfficialsAttorney John Garfield Dillard added to party Association of American Feed Control Officials(pty:dft) (Dillard, John)
August 2, 2019 Filing 50 RESPONSE to #12 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction PLAINTIFFS COMBINED MOTION AND MEMORANDUM FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 65(a)(2) filed by Defendants Food and Drug Administration, United States Department of Health and Human Services. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Healy, Meredith)
July 31, 2019 Filing 49 REPLY to Response to #45 First MOTION for Hearing/Conference PLAINTIFFS COMBINED MOTION AND MEMORANDUM FOR EXPEDITED STATUS CONFERENCE OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, CONFIRMATION THE COURTS ORDER OF JULY 8, 2019 (DOC. NO. 37) REMAINS IN FULL FORCE PLAINTIFFS COMBINED SURREPLY TO DEFENDANTS ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION AND MEMORANDUM FOR EXPEDITED STATUS CONFERENCE OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, CONFIRMATION THE COURTS ORDER OF JULY 8, 2019 (DOC. NO. 37) REMAINS IN FULL FORCE filed by Plaintiff Lystn, LLC. (O'Keefe, Joseph)
July 30, 2019 Filing 48 RESPONSE to #45 First MOTION for Hearing/Conference PLAINTIFFS COMBINED MOTION AND MEMORANDUM FOR EXPEDITED STATUS CONFERENCE OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, CONFIRMATION THE COURTS ORDER OF JULY 8, 2019 (DOC. NO. 37) REMAINS IN FULL FORCE filed by Defendants Colorado Department of Agriculture, Kate Greenberg, Kate (I) Greenberg, Laurel Hamling, Laurel (I) Hamling, Scott Ziehr, Scott (I) Ziehr. (Kooyman, Charles)
July 30, 2019 Filing 47 RESPONSE to #45 First MOTION for Hearing/Conference PLAINTIFFS COMBINED MOTION AND MEMORANDUM FOR EXPEDITED STATUS CONFERENCE OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, CONFIRMATION THE COURTS ORDER OF JULY 8, 2019 (DOC. NO. 37) REMAINS IN FULL FORCE filed by Defendants Food and Drug Administration, United States Department of Health and Human Services. (Healy, Meredith)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MEMORANDUM regarding #45 First MOTION for Hearing/Conference PLAINTIFFS COMBINED MOTION AND MEMORANDUM FOR EXPEDITED STATUS CONFERENCE OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, CONFIRMATION THE COURTS ORDER OF JULY 8, 2019 (DOC. NO. 37) REMAINS IN FULL FORCE filed by Lystn, LLC. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 7/30/19. Text Only Entry (pabsec)
July 30, 2019 Filing 45 First MOTION for Hearing/Conference PLAINTIFFS COMBINED MOTION AND MEMORANDUM FOR EXPEDITED STATUS CONFERENCE OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, CONFIRMATION THE COURTS ORDER OF JULY 8, 2019 (DOC. NO. 37) REMAINS IN FULL FORCE by Plaintiff Lystn, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(O'Keefe, Joseph)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix for non-dispositive matters. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, and (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. By Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 7/30/19. Text Only Entry (pabsec)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MINUTE ORDER granting #42 Motion to Exceed Page Limitations. The federal defendants may file a response to plaintiff's motion for injunctive relief #12 not to exceed 20 pages. By Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 7/30/19. Text Only Entry(pabsec)
July 30, 2019 Filing 42 Unopposed MOTION for Order to File 20-Page Response to Plaintiff's Combined Motion and Memorandum for Injunctive Relief Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 65(a)(2) [Docket No. 12] by Defendants Food and Drug Administration, United States Department of Health and Human Services. (Healy, Meredith)
July 29, 2019 Filing 41 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Billy Lee Seiber on behalf of Colorado Department of Agriculture, Kate Greenberg, Kate (I) Greenberg, Laurel Hamling, Laurel (I) Hamling, Scott Ziehr, Scott (I) ZiehrAttorney Billy Lee Seiber added to party Colorado Department of Agriculture(pty:dft), Attorney Billy Lee Seiber added to party Kate Greenberg(pty:dft), Attorney Billy Lee Seiber added to party Kate (I) Greenberg(pty:dft), Attorney Billy Lee Seiber added to party Laurel Hamling(pty:dft), Attorney Billy Lee Seiber added to party Laurel (I) Hamling(pty:dft), Attorney Billy Lee Seiber added to party Scott Ziehr(pty:dft), Attorney Billy Lee Seiber added to party Scott (I) Ziehr(pty:dft) (Seiber, Billy)
July 29, 2019 Filing 40 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Charles Jason Kooyman on behalf of Colorado Department of Agriculture, Kate Greenberg, Kate (I) Greenberg, Laurel Hamling, Laurel (I) Hamling, Scott Ziehr, Scott (I) ZiehrAttorney Charles Jason Kooyman added to party Colorado Department of Agriculture(pty:dft), Attorney Charles Jason Kooyman added to party Kate Greenberg(pty:dft), Attorney Charles Jason Kooyman added to party Kate (I) Greenberg(pty:dft), Attorney Charles Jason Kooyman added to party Laurel Hamling(pty:dft), Attorney Charles Jason Kooyman added to party Laurel (I) Hamling(pty:dft), Attorney Charles Jason Kooyman added to party Scott Ziehr(pty:dft), Attorney Charles Jason Kooyman added to party Scott (I) Ziehr(pty:dft) (Kooyman, Charles)
July 9, 2019 Filing 39 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Senior Judge Blackburn. This case is randomly reassigned to Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-01943-PAB. (athom, )
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER DIRECTING REASSIGNMENT re Plaintiff's #12 Combined Motion and Memorandum for Injunctive Relief Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 65(a)(2). IT IS ORDERED that the clerk of the court shall assign this case to a judge for resolution on the merits under the random assignment procedure of D.C.COLO.LCiv.R 40.1. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 07/09/2019. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-01943-REB. (athom, )
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 VACATED - ORDER REGARDING INSTRUCTIONS FOR JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 7/8/2019. (evana, ) Modified on 8/9/2019 to vacate pursuant to #55 Minute Order. (nmarb, ).
July 5, 2019 Filing 36 SUMMONSES issued by Clerk. (athom, )
July 5, 2019 Filing 35 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Colorado Department of Agriculture re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Lystn, LLC. (O'Keefe, Joseph)
July 5, 2019 Filing 34 SUMMONS REQUEST as to U.S. Department of Health and Human Services re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Lystn, LLC. (O'Keefe, Joseph)
July 5, 2019 Filing 33 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Scott Ziehr, Feed Program Regulatory Administrator for Colorado Department of Agriculture re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Lystn, LLC. (O'Keefe, Joseph)
July 5, 2019 Filing 32 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Scott Ziehr, Individually re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Lystn, LLC. (O'Keefe, Joseph)
July 5, 2019 Filing 31 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Laurel Hamling, Feed Program Administrator for Colorado Department of Agriculture re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Lystn, LLC. (O'Keefe, Joseph)
July 5, 2019 Filing 30 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Laurel Hamling, Individually re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Lystn, LLC. (O'Keefe, Joseph)
July 5, 2019 Filing 29 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Kate Greenberg, Commissioner of the Colorado Department of Agriculture re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Lystn, LLC. (O'Keefe, Joseph)
July 5, 2019 Filing 28 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Kate Greenberg, Individually re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Lystn, LLC. (O'Keefe, Joseph)
July 5, 2019 Filing 27 SUMMONS REQUEST as to American Association of Feed Control Officials re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Lystn, LLC. (O'Keefe, Joseph)
July 5, 2019 Filing 26 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Food and Drug Administrationation re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Lystn, LLC. (O'Keefe, Joseph)
July 5, 2019 Filing 25 Administrative Notice : The #15 , #16 , #17 , #18 , #19 , #20 , #21 , #22 , #23 , #24 Summonses submitted will not be issued. Any summons submitted must include and contain all language that is on the court's AO 440 Summons form. (Text Only Entry) (athom, )
July 5, 2019 Filing 24 SUMMONS REQUEST as to U.S. Department of Health and Human Services re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Lystn, LLC. (O'Keefe, Joseph)
July 5, 2019 Filing 23 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Scott Ziehr, Feed Program Regulatory Administrator for Colorado Department of Agriculture re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Lystn, LLC. (O'Keefe, Joseph)
July 5, 2019 Filing 22 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Scott Ziehr, Individually re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Lystn, LLC. (O'Keefe, Joseph)
July 5, 2019 Filing 21 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Laurel Hamling, Feed Program Administrator for Colorado Department of Agriculture re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Lystn, LLC. (O'Keefe, Joseph)
July 5, 2019 Filing 20 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Laurel Hamling, Individually re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Lystn, LLC. (O'Keefe, Joseph)
July 5, 2019 Filing 19 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Kate Greenberg, Commissioner of the Colorado Department of Agriculture re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Lystn, LLC. (O'Keefe, Joseph)
July 5, 2019 Filing 18 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Kate Greenberg, Individually re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Lystn, LLC. (O'Keefe, Joseph)
July 5, 2019 Filing 17 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Colorado Department of Agriculture re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Lystn, LLC. (O'Keefe, Joseph)
July 5, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS REQUEST as to American Association of Feed Control Officials re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Lystn, LLC. (O'Keefe, Joseph)
July 5, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Food and Drug Administrationation re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Lystn, LLC. (O'Keefe, Joseph)
July 5, 2019 Filing 14 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). No Summons Issued, the Summons supplied have an incomplete party caption. Summons must include all parties in the header section to be issued. (rroge, )
July 5, 2019 Filing 13 Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Text Only Entry. (rroge, )
July 5, 2019 Filing 12 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction PLAINTIFFS COMBINED MOTION AND MEMORANDUM FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 65(a)(2) by Plaintiff LYSTN, LLC d/b/a ANSWERS PET FOOD. (O'Keefe, Joseph)
July 5, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS REQUEST as to U.S. Department of Health and Human Services re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff LYSTN, LLC d/b/a ANSWERS PET FOOD. (O'Keefe, Joseph)
July 5, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Scott Ziehr, Individually re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff LYSTN, LLC d/b/a ANSWERS PET FOOD. (O'Keefe, Joseph)
July 5, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Scott Ziehr, Feed Program Regulatory Administrator for Colorado Department of Agriculture re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff LYSTN, LLC d/b/a ANSWERS PET FOOD. (O'Keefe, Joseph)
July 5, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Laurel Hamling, Individually re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff LYSTN, LLC d/b/a ANSWERS PET FOOD. (O'Keefe, Joseph)
July 5, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Laurel Hamling, Feed Program Administrator for Colorado Department of Agriculture re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff LYSTN, LLC d/b/a ANSWERS PET FOOD. (O'Keefe, Joseph)
July 5, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Kate Greenberg, Individually re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff LYSTN, LLC d/b/a ANSWERS PET FOOD. (O'Keefe, Joseph)
July 5, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Kate Greenberg, Commissioner of the Colorado Department of Agriculture re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff LYSTN, LLC d/b/a ANSWERS PET FOOD. (O'Keefe, Joseph)
July 5, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Colorado Department of Agriculture re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff LYSTN, LLC d/b/a ANSWERS PET FOOD. (O'Keefe, Joseph)
July 5, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS REQUEST as to American Association of Feed Control Officials re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff LYSTN, LLC d/b/a ANSWERS PET FOOD. (O'Keefe, Joseph)
July 5, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Food and Drug Administration re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff LYSTN, LLC d/b/a ANSWERS PET FOOD. (O'Keefe, Joseph)
July 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6775192)Attorney Joseph Anthony O'Keefe added to party LYSTN, LLC d/b/a ANSWERS PET FOOD(pty:pla), filed by LYSTN, LLC d/b/a ANSWERS PET FOOD.(O'Keefe, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lystn, LLCv. Food and Drug Administration et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colorado Department of Agriculture
Represented By: Billy Lee Seiber
Represented By: Lindsey Marie Knapton
Represented By: Charles Jason Kooyman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Food and Drug Administration
Represented By: Meredith Burns Healy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laurel (I) Hamling
Represented By: Billy Lee Seiber
Represented By: Lindsey Marie Knapton
Represented By: Charles Jason Kooyman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kate Greenberg
Represented By: Billy Lee Seiber
Represented By: Lindsey Marie Knapton
Represented By: Charles Jason Kooyman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laurel Hamling
Represented By: Billy Lee Seiber
Represented By: Lindsey Marie Knapton
Represented By: Charles Jason Kooyman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott (I) Ziehr
Represented By: Billy Lee Seiber
Represented By: Lindsey Marie Knapton
Represented By: Charles Jason Kooyman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Ziehr
Represented By: Billy Lee Seiber
Represented By: Lindsey Marie Knapton
Represented By: Charles Jason Kooyman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Health and Human Services
Represented By: Meredith Burns Healy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Association of American Feed Control Officials
Represented By: Stacy Kourlis Guillon
Represented By: Kenneth F. Rossman, IV
Represented By: John Garfield Dillard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kate (I) Greenberg
Represented By: Billy Lee Seiber
Represented By: Lindsey Marie Knapton
Represented By: Charles Jason Kooyman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lystn, LLC
Represented By: Joseph Anthony O'Keefe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lystn, LLC doing business as Answers Pet Food
Represented By: Joseph Anthony O'Keefe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?