Ramales v. EF Collection, LLC
Plaintiff: Felipe Ramales
Defendant: EF Collection, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv01957
Filed: July 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: David M Ebel
Referring Judge: Kristen L Mix
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 7/19/19. Scheduling Conference set for 10/10/2019 11:00 AM in Courtroom A401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2, #3 Attachment 3) (lgale, )
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and F.R.Civ.P. 72(a) and (b), United States Magistrate Judge Kristin L. Mix is designated to conduct proceedings in this civil action as follows: Convene a scheduling conference under F.R.Civ.P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2. ; Conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause; Convene such settlement conferences and direct related procedures authorized by law and the Federal Rules as may facilitate resolution of this case; Hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions; Conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions; Conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order, by Judge David M. Ebel on 7/10/2019. (evana, )
July 8, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (cmadr, )
July 8, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge David M. Ebel and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
July 8, 2019 Filing 2 Report re Copyright: Report on the filing of an action emailed separately to the Director of the Copyright Office. (cmadr, )
July 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against EF Collection, LLC (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6776546)Attorney Richard Liebowitz added to party Felipe Ramales(pty:pla), filed by Felipe Ramales. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Summons, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Copyright Form)(Liebowitz, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramales v. EF Collection, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felipe Ramales
Represented By: Richard Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EF Collection, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?