Romero vs. Choate
Petitioner: Isamar Victoria Rojas Romero
Respondent: Kevin K. McAleenan, William Barr, Kristi Barrows and Johnny Choate
Case Number: 1:2019cv01958
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Nina Y Wang
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241in
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2019 Filing 19 Civil Case Terminated pursuant to #18 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Case filed in this case on 7/26/2019. Text Only Entry. (agarc, )
July 26, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case by Petitioner Isamar Victoria Rojas Romero (Chonillo, Gregory)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER OF REFERENCE. Pursuant to the consent of the parties to the jurisdiction of the magistrate judge #6 and #15 , this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang for all purposes pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). By Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 7/24/2019. Text Only Entry. (sphil, )
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Reset. Show Cause Hearing set for 8/2/2019 is RESET for 8/12/2019 03:30 PM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 7.23.2019. Text Only Entry(nywlc1, )
July 23, 2019 Filing 15 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Respondents William Barr, Kristi Barrows, Johnny Choate, Kevin K. McAleenan All parties consent.. (Brenton, Kyle)
July 23, 2019 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION to Reset Reschedule Hearing on Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Respondents William Barr, Kristi Barrows, Johnny Choate, Kevin K. McAleenan. (Brenton, Kyle)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER : Pending before the court is a timely Consent/Non-Consent Form #11 . However, counsel for Respondents did not sign the Form and instead the Form reflects his "verbal consent." This is insufficient. Before the close of business today (5:00 p.m.), the parties shall submit a completed Consent/Non-Consent Form signed by all parties. Because the submitted Form already reflects Applicant's counsel's valid signature, the court would accept another form signed unilaterally by Respondent's counsel. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 7.23.2019. Text Only Entry (nywlc1, )
July 23, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kyle W. Brenton on behalf of William Barr, Kristi Barrows, Johnny Choate, Kevin K. McAleenanAttorney Kyle W. Brenton added to party William Barr(pty:res), Attorney Kyle W. Brenton added to party Kristi Barrows(pty:res), Attorney Kyle W. Brenton added to party Johnny Choate(pty:res), Attorney Kyle W. Brenton added to party Kevin K. McAleenan(pty:res) (Brenton, Kyle)
July 22, 2019 Filing 11 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Petitioner Isamar Victoria Rojas Romero All parties consent.. (Chonillo, Gregory)
July 11, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of Service by E-Mail through CM/ECF by Clerk of Court re #1 Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus, and #7 Order to Show Cause, to Kevin Traskos at the United States Attorneys Office at: Kevin.Traskos@usdoj.gov. Text Only Entry (nmarb, )
July 11, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Service by Mail by Clerk of Court re #1 Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #7 Order to Show Cause, to Kristi Barrows, ICE District Director of Denver, 12484 East Weaver Place, Centennial, CO 80111; Johnny Choate, Warden of Aurora Contract Detention Center, 3130 North Oakland St., Aurora, CO 80010; Kevin K. McAleenan, Acting Secretary of DHS, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, 3801 Nebraska Ave. NW, Washington, DC 20016; William Barr, Attorney General of the United States, US Department of Justice, 950 Pennsylvania Ave., NW, Washington, DC 20530. Text Only Entry (nmarb, )
July 10, 2019 Filing 8 Utility Setting/Resetting Deadlines/Hearings: Text Only Entry Consent Form due by 7/22/2019 pursuant to #7 Order to Show Cause. (nmarb, )
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 7/10/19, returnable by Respondents to show cause why the Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus should not be granted. Show Cause Hearing set for 8/2/2019 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Show Cause Response due by 7/30/2019. Consent form due on or before 7/22/19. If the parties do not consent, the Motion Hearing will be automatically vacated. The Clerk of the Court shall send a copy of the Application [#1] and this Order to Show Cause to Respondents. (nmarb, )
July 8, 2019 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. No Summons Issued. (cmadr, )
July 8, 2019 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
July 8, 2019 Filing 4 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: Gregory Victor Chonillo. The document was scanned and not converted directly to portable document format (PDF). DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 1.3(f) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). (Text Only Entry) (cmadr, )
July 8, 2019 Filing 3 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: Gregory Victor Chonillo. Attorney or pro se has used an incorrect signature format in violation of D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(a) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. In the future, the filer must affix an electronic s/signature and s/followed by a typed, not an inked, signature to all future documents.(Text Only Entry) (cmadr, )
July 8, 2019 Filing 2 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number COX091003 (cmadr, ) Modified to correct entry on 7/8/2019 (cmadr, ).
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 First APPLICATION for Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 USC 2241 (Filing fee $ 5)Attorney Gregory Victor Chonillo added to party Isamar Victoria Rojas Romero(pty:dft), filed by Isamar Victoria Rojas Romero.(Chonillo, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Romero vs. Choate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kevin K. McAleenan
Represented By: Kyle W. Brenton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William Barr
Represented By: Kyle W. Brenton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kristi Barrows
Represented By: Kyle W. Brenton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Johnny Choate
Represented By: Kyle W. Brenton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Isamar Victoria Rojas Romero
Represented By: Gregory Victor Chonillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?