Van Romburgh v. Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Plaintiff: Ansa M. Van Romburgh
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv01962
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Daniel D Domenico
Referring Judge: N Reid Neureiter
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice #31 Motion to Appoint Pro Bono Counsel, by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 9/4/2019.(tsher, )
August 30, 2019 Filing 42 REPLY to Response to #16 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Edwards, Erin)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MINUTE ORDER granting #36 Motion to Continue Scheduling Conference, by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 8/27/2019. The Scheduling Conference set on 9/25/2019 at 10:30 a.m. is VACATED. PLEASE READ ATTACHED MINUTE ORDER. (tsher, )
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #36 Motion to Continue Scheduling Conference Set for September 25, 2019 filed by Nationstar Mortgage LLC. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 8/27/2019. Text Only Entry (dddlc1, )
August 27, 2019 Filing 37 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Nationstar Mortgage LLC All parties do not consent.. (Edwards, Erin)
August 27, 2019 Filing 36 MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference Set for September 25, 2019 by Defendant Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Order Granting Motion to Continue Scheduling Conference)(Edwards, Erin)
August 26, 2019 Filing 41 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re: #39 Response to Motion. The document does not contain a certification of compliance with the word/page limitations set forth in Judge Domenico's Practice Standards. Because the document is within the word/page limits set forth in the Practice Standards, Plaintiff need not refile the document. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must contain a certificate of compliance pursuant to DDD Civ. P.S. III(A)(4). A copy of Judge Domenico's Practice Standards can be found at http://www.cod.uscourts.gov/Portals/0/Documents/Judges/DDD/DDD_Civil_Practice_Standards.pdf. (Text Only Entry) (dddlc1, )
August 26, 2019 Filing 39 RESPONSE to #16 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff Ansa M. Van Romburgh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Envelope) (athom, )
August 16, 2019 Filing 35 REPLY to Response to #18 MOTION to Stay Pending Ruling on Motions to Dismiss filed by Defendant Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Edwards, Erin)
August 16, 2019 Filing 34 REPLY to Response to #16 MOTION to Dismiss and Response to #26 Motion to Correct Complaint and to Stay Defendant's Defenses and Motions filed by Defendant Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Edwards, Erin) Modified on 8/18/2019 to create linkage (athom, ).
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #31 Motion to Appoint Pro Bono Counsel filed by Ansa M. Van Romburgh. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 8/13/2019. Text Only Entry (dddlc1, )
August 12, 2019 Filing 33 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re: #31 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. The document does not contain a certification of compliance with the word/page limitations set forth in Judge Domenico's Practice Standards. Because the document is within the word/page limits set forth in the Practice Standards, Plaintiff need not refile the document. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must contain a certificate of compliance pursuant to DDD Civ. P.S. III(A)(4). A copy of Judge Domenico's Practice Standards can be found at http://www.cod.uscourts.gov/Portals/0/Documents/Judges/DDD/DDD_Civil_Practice_Standards.pdf. (Text Only Entry) (dddlc1, )
August 12, 2019 Filing 31 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel by Plaintiff Ansa M. Van Romburgh. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (athom, )
August 8, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of Correction by Defendant Nationstar Mortgage LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Amended Civil Cover Sheet)(Edwards, Erin)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MINUTE ORDER re: #26 MOTION to Correct #6 Complaint and to Stay Defendant's Defense and Motions filed by Ansa M. Van Romburgh, by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 8/6/2019. PLEASE READ ATTACHED MINUTE ORDER. (tsher, )
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #26 Motion to Correct #6 Complaint and to Stay Defendant's Defense and Motions filed by Ansa M. Van Romburgh. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 8/5/2019. Text Only Entry (dddlc1, )
August 5, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION to Correct #6 Complaint and to Stay Defendant's Defense and Motions by Plaintiff Ansa M. Van Romburgh. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (athom, )
August 5, 2019 Filing 25 RESPONSE to #18 MOTION to Stay Pending Ruling on Motions to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff Ansa M. Van Romburgh. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (athom, )
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 7/30/2019 re: #16 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Nationstar Mortgage LLC and #18 MOTION to Stay Pending Ruling on Motions to Dismiss filed by Nationstar Mortgage LLC. Motion Hearing set for 9/19/2019 02:00 PM in Courtroom C205 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. PLEASE READ ATTACHED MINUTE ORDER. (tsher, )
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER REFERRING MOTIONS: #16 Motion to Dismiss and #18 Motion to Stay Pending Ruling on Motions to Dismiss filed by Nationstar Mortgage LLC. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 7/26/2019. Text Only Entry (dddlc1, )
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Denying #13 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. By Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 07/26/2019. (athom, )
July 25, 2019 Filing 21 Response to Defendant's #19 Opposition to #13 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Plaintiff's) filed by Plaintiff Ansa M. Van Romburgh. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (athom, )
July 23, 2019 Filing 30 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re: #20 Reply to Response to Motion, #21 Reply to Response to Motion, #25 Response to Motion to Stay, and #26 Motion to Correct Complaint and to Stay Defendant's Defense and Motions. These documents do not contain a certification of compliance with the word/page limitations set forth in Judge Domenico's Practice Standards. Because the documents are within the word/page limits set forth in the Practice Standards, Plaintiff need not refile the documents. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENTS. Action to take - future documents must contain a certificate of compliance pursuant to DDD Civ. P.S. III(A)(4). A copy of Judge Domenico's Practice Standards can be found at http://www.cod.uscourts.gov/Portals/0/Documents/Judges/DDD/DDD_Civil_Practice_Standards.pdf. (Text Only Entry) (dddlc1, )
July 23, 2019 Filing 20 Response to Defendant's #19 Opposition to #13 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Plaintiff's) filed by Plaintiff Ansa M. Van Romburgh. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (athom, )
July 15, 2019 Filing 19 RESPONSE to #13 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Plaintiff's) filed by Defendant Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Edwards, Erin)
July 15, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Stay Pending Ruling on Motions to Dismiss by Defendant Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Edwards, Erin)
July 15, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE re #16 MOTION to Dismiss Request for Judicial Notice by Defendant Nationstar Mortgage LLC (Edwards, Erin)
July 15, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Envelope H, #9 Exhibit I)(Edwards, Erin)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. It is ORDERED that Defendant Nationstar shall respond to Plaintiff Van Romburgh's motion [Doc. #13 ] on or before Tuesday, July 16, 2019. Plaintiff Van Romburgh may file a reply in support of her motion for TRO on or before July 23, 2019. Plaintiff's Motion for Recusal of Judge [Doc. #14 ] is DENIED AS MOOT, as Judge Plewe is no longer the presiding judge on this case. By Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 07/12/2019. (athom, ) Modified on 7/15/2019 to correct text (athom, ).
July 12, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Recusal (Plaintiff's) by Defendant Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Edwards, Erin)
July 12, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Plaintiff's) by Defendant Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Edwards, Erin)
July 9, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of Service by Mail by Clerk of Court re #11 Order to Ansa M. Van Romburgh 6537 North 55th Avenue Unit 744 Glendale, AZ 85311. Text Only Entry (tsher, )
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 7/9/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 9/25/2019 10:30 AM in Courtroom C205 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. (tsher, )
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions, and (5) pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 7/8/2019. Text Only Entry (dddlc1, )
July 8, 2019 Filing 9 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (rvill, )
July 8, 2019 Filing 8 Case assigned to Judge Daniel D. Domenico and drawn to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
July 8, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Affidavit of Service upon Nationstar Mortgage LLC on 06/24/2019. (rvill, )
July 8, 2019 Filing 6 Plaintiff's COMPLAINT against Nationstar Mortgage LLC, filed by Ansa M. Van Romburgh.(rvill, )
July 8, 2019 Filing 5 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (rvill, )
July 8, 2019 Filing 4 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES re: #1 Notice of Removal and #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by attorney Justin Donald Balser. The s/signature did not match the filers name on the account for which the login and password are registered. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(c) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases).(Text Only Entry) (rvill, )
July 8, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Balser, Justin)
July 8, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Justin Donald Balser on behalf of Nationstar Mortgage LLC d/b/a Mr. Cooper (Balser, Justin)
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Nationstar Mortgage LLC d/b/a Mr. Cooper from Montezuma County District Court, Case Number 2019CV4. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-6777681), filed by Nationstar Mortgage LLC d/b/a Mr. Cooper. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Balser, Justin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Van Romburgh v. Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ansa M. Van Romburgh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Represented By: Justin Donald Balser
Represented By: Erin Elizabeth Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?