Dziak v. Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Bruce G Dziak
Defendant: Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Interested Party: USAO-SS-Noticing and SSA Noticing
Case Number: 1:2019cv01970
Filed: July 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Robert E Blackburn
Nature of Suit: Social Security - SSID Title XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2019 Filing 8 ADVISORY NOTICE TO ATTORNEY AND COURT: Under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3(a), ALEX ZIMMERMAN was administratively removed from the court's attorney roll and barred from filing electronically under CM/ECF for failing to pay the 2018 Biennial Fee by January 31, 2019. Counsel must complete a Bar/ECF application through counsel's Attorney Services Portal account and pay the full application fee to be restored to the attorney roll and CM/ECF. (Text Only Entry) (mfred)
July 22, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by J. Benedict Garcia on behalf of Commissioner, Social Security AdministrationAttorney J. Benedict Garcia added to party Commissioner, Social Security Administration(pty:dft) (Garcia, J.)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REGARDING INSTRUCTIONS FOR JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 07/09/2019. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Form) (athom, )
July 9, 2019 Filing 5 Utility Setting Deadlines: Commissioner, Social Security Administration answer due 9/7/2019. Text Only Entry (athom, )
July 9, 2019 Filing 4 Administrative Notice: Social Security Case Service. Pursuant to the Letter of Agreement signed by the Clerk, U.S. District Court;U.S. Attorneys Office for the District of Colorado (USAO), and Social Security Administration (SSA), service of the initiating document(s) by the plaintiff to the SSA, the U.S. Attorney General, and USAO in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(i) is not necessary unless the court otherwise orders. A summons is not required and will not be issued. (Text Only Entry) (rroge, )
July 9, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (rroge, )
July 9, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Text Only Entry. (rroge, )
July 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Petition to Review against Andrew M. Saul (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6779657)Attorney Alex Zimmerman added to party Bruce G Dziak(pty:pla), filed by Bruce G Dziak. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Zimmerman, Alex)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dziak v. Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: USAO-SS-Noticing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Noticing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Represented By: J. Benedict Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce G Dziak
Represented By: Alex Zimmerman
Represented By: Michael Alexander Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?