Rani v. Barr et al
Petitioner: Dalvir Singh Rani
Respondent: Ronald Vitiello, Jeffrey D Lynch, Johnny Choate, Kirstjen M. Nielsen and William P. Barr
Case Number: 1:2019cv02017
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
Presiding Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Referring Judge: R Brooke Jackson
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kyle W. Brenton on behalf of William P. BarrAttorney Kyle W. Brenton added to party William P. Barr(pty:res) (Brenton, Kyle)
August 26, 2019 Filing 15 Return Receipt of Service on behalf of United States Attorney General (angar, )
August 14, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of Service by Clerk of Court re, #11 Amended Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #12 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE for Service of Process (Attachments: #1 USPS Certified Mail Receipt) (rsams, )
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Drawing Case, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 8/13/2019. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge R. Brooke Jackson and drawn to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-2017-RBJ (angar, )
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER to Show Cause. Within thirty (30) days of Respondent's answer to this Order Petitioner may file a Reply, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 8/13/2019. (angar, )
July 31, 2019 Filing 11 AMENDED APPLICATION for Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241, filed by Dalvir Singh Rani.(angar, )
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DIRECTING PETITIONER TO CURE DEFICIENCIES by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 7/12/19. The Clerk shall mail Petitioner the Application for a Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241 form (mailed as ordered). (dkals, )
July 12, 2019 Filing 9 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
July 12, 2019 Filing 8 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (cmadr, )
July 12, 2019 Filing 7 Case transferred in from District of California Northern; Case Number 3:19-cv-01990. File, transfer order and docket sheet received.
July 12, 2019 Remark Case Transferred to District of Colorado (amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/12/2019.]
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 7/11/2019. The deputy clerk hereby certifies that on 7/12/2019, a copy of this order was served by sending it via first-class mail to the address of each non-CM/ECF user listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/12/2019.]
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge William Alsup for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 4/30/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/12/2019.]
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE TO A DISTRICT JUDGE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 4/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/12/2019.]
April 25, 2019 Filing 3 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge filed by Dalvir Singh Rani. (Attachments: #(1) Envelope) (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/12/2019.]
April 12, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to a United States Magistrate Judge. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/12/2019.]
April 12, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 2241 (no process) against William P. Barr, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Ronald Vitiello, Jeffrey D. Lynch & Johnny Choate, (Filing Fee: $5.00, receipt number 34611141795). Filed by Dalvir Singh Rani. (Attachments: #(1) Filing Fee Receipt, #(2) Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, #(3) Request for Counsel, #(4) Certificate of Service) (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/12/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rani v. Barr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ronald Vitiello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jeffrey D Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Johnny Choate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kirstjen M. Nielsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William P. Barr
Represented By: Kyle W. Brenton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Dalvir Singh Rani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?