Rios v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Marina Rios
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv02030
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Philip A Brimmer
Referring Judge: S Kato Crews
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2019 Filing 22 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #20 by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Zahradnik-Mitchell, Robert)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER: In light of the #20 Order to Show Cause, the Scheduling Conference is VACATED. If and when the Show Cause Order is discharged the parties shall initiate a joint conference call and contact Judge Crews' chambers (303.335.2124) within 72-hours to reset the Scheduling Conference. By Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 9/4/2019. Text Only Entry (skclc1)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 8/30/2019. ORDERED that, on or before September 10, 2019, defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company shall show cause why this case should not be remanded to state court due to the Courts lack of subject matter jurisdiction. (sphil, )
August 29, 2019 Filing 19 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #17 Consent/Non-Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-02030-PAB. (Text Only Entry) (jgonz, )
August 28, 2019 Filing 18 Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Zahradnik-Mitchell, Robert)
August 28, 2019 Filing 17 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company All parties do not consent.. (Zahradnik-Mitchell, Robert)
August 28, 2019 Filing 16 SUPPLEMENT/AMENDMENT to #12 Answer to Complaint, #5 Complaint, #13 Partial MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Fourth and Fifth Claims for Relief Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12b6 Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Marina Rios. (Quinlivan, Meredith)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER changing courtroom location. The Scheduling Conference set for 9/4/2019 at 11:00 a.m. will be held in Courtroom C201 in the Byron Rogers Courthouse located at 1929 Stout Street, Denver, CO 80294. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 8/28/19. Text Only Entry (amont, )
July 23, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Robert Alan Zahradnik-Mitchell on behalf of State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company Attorney Robert Alan Zahradnik-Mitchell added to party State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (pty:dft) (Zahradnik-Mitchell, Robert)
July 22, 2019 Filing 13 Partial MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Fourth and Fifth Claims for Relief Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12b6 by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Wagner, Rebecca)
July 22, 2019 Filing 12 Defendant's ANSWER to #5 Complaint and Jury Demand Attorney Rebecca Kirsten Wagner added to party State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (pty:dft) by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.(Wagner, Rebecca)
July 16, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Meredith Ann Quinlivan on behalf of Marina RiosAttorney Meredith Ann Quinlivan added to party Marina Rios(pty:pla) (Quinlivan, Meredith)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER Setting Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference set for 9/4/2019 11:00 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. The parties shall file their proposed scheduling order, and email a copy in Word format to Crews_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, on or before 8/28/2019. Consent Form due by 8/28/2019. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 7/16/19. Text Only Entry (amont, )
July 16, 2019 Filing 9 SUPPLEMENT/AMENDMENT to #1 Notice of Removal,, Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet For Notices of Removal by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Frazier, Michael)
July 15, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Summons and Complaint upon State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company on 6/18/2019 (rroge, )
July 15, 2019 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (rroge, )
July 15, 2019 Filing 6 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry. (rroge, )
July 15, 2019 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, filed by Marina Rios.(rroge, )
July 15, 2019 Filing 4 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (rroge, )
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 DOCKETED IN ERROR Administrative Notice: No filing fee received with case opening. Attorney contacted with instructions to submit filing fee within 3 hours. (Text Only Entry) (rroge, ) Modified on 7/15/2019 to note that the docket entry was made in error. Contacted Finance to confirm payment (rroge, ).
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Frazier, Michael)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company from Denver County District Court, Case Number 2019CV32248. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-6790256), filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Docket Sheet, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit A, #6 Exhibit A, #7 Exhibit A, #8 Exhibit A, #9 Exhibit A, #10 Exhibit A, #11 Exhibit A, #12 Exhibit A, #13 Exhibit A, #14 Exhibit B)(Frazier, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rios v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael O. Frazier
Represented By: Robert Alan Zahradnik-Mitchell
Represented By: Rebecca Kirsten Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marina Rios
Represented By: Meredith Ann Quinlivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?