Lobatos v. Denver Hotels, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Ana Lobatos
Defendant: Nilay Patel and Denver Hotels, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv02035
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: David M Ebel
Referring Judge: Scott T Varholak
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #18 Motion to Stay. The Motion is GRANTED to the extent the parties seek to stay this matter. The Motion is DENIED to the extent the parties seek an indefinite stay. This matter is STAYED until 11/8/2019. The parties shall file a status report regarding the status of settlement negotiations on or before 11/4/2019. The Scheduling Conference set for 9/24/2019 at 11:30 AM is VACATED and all deadlines are STAYED. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 8/29/2019. Text Only Entry(stvlc2, ) Modified on 8/30/2019 correct docket text (jgonz, ).
August 29, 2019 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM regarding #18 Joint MOTION to Stay all Proceedings filed by Denver Hotels, LLC. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak, by Judge David M. Ebel on 8/29/2019. Text Only Entry (evana, )
August 29, 2019 Filing 18 Joint MOTION to Stay all Proceedings by Defendant Denver Hotels, LLC. (Patrick, Nadia)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #15 Motion to Vacate. The Scheduling Conference set for 9/20/2019 10:30 AM is VACATED and RESET for 9/24/2019 11:30 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. The parties shall file a joint proposed scheduling order on or before 9/17/2019. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 8/22/2019. Text Only Entry(stvlc2, )
August 22, 2019 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM regarding #15 Unopposed MOTION to Vacate SCHEDULING CONFERENCE filed by Ana Lobatos. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak, by Judge David M. Ebel on 8/22/2019. Text Only Entry (evana, )
August 21, 2019 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION to Vacate SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Plaintiff Ana Lobatos. (Milstein, Brandt)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER. This matter is before the Court on Defendants' failure to respond to the #3 MOTION to Certify Class MOTION FOR CONDITIONAL COLLECTIVE ACTION CERTIFICATION. The Court sua sponte extends until August 30, 2019 the deadline for Defendants to respond to the Motion. Defendants are cautioned that, should they fail to file a timely response to the Motion, the Court may issue a recommendation on the Motion without consideration of any arguments offered by Defendants and Defendants' arguments in opposition to the Motion to Certify Class may be deemed waived. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 8/20/2019. Text Only Entry (stvlc2, )
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading until 8/30/2019, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 8/12/2019. Text Only Entry(stvlc1, )
August 9, 2019 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM regarding #11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, filed by Nilay Patel, Denver Hotels, LLC. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak by Judge David M. Ebel on 8/9/2019. Text Only Entry (evana, )
August 9, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, by Defendants Denver Hotels, LLC, Nilay Patel. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Patrick, Nadia)
July 25, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ana Lobatos. Nilay Patel served on 7/24/2019, answer due 8/14/2019. (Milstein, Brandt)
July 24, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ana Lobatos. Denver Hotels, LLC served on 7/19/2019, answer due 8/9/2019. (Milstein, Brandt)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 9/20/2019 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Proposed Scheduling Order due 9/13/2019, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 7/18/2019. (jgonz, )
July 17, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM regarding #3 MOTION to Certify Class MOTION FOR CONDITIONAL COLLECTIVE ACTION CERTIFICATION filed by Ana Lobatos. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak, by Judge David M. Ebel on 7/17/2019. Text Only Entry (evana, )
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF REFERENCE TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b) (1)(A) and (B) and F.R.Civ.P. 72(a) and (b), United States Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak is designated to conduct proceedings in this civil action as follows: Convene a scheduling conference under F.R.Civ.P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2. Conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause. Convene such settlement conferences and direct related procedures authorized by law and the Federal Rules as may facilitate resolution of this case. Hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions. Conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions. Conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order, by Judge David M. Ebel on 7/17/2019. (evana, )
July 15, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (rvill, )
July 15, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Judge David M. Ebel and drawn to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Certify Class MOTION FOR CONDITIONAL COLLECTIVE ACTION CERTIFICATION by Plaintiff Ana Lobatos. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Milstein, Brandt)
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Denver Hotels, LLC and Nilay Patel by Plaintiff Ana Lobatos. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Milstein, Brandt)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT CLASS AND COLLECTIVE ACTION COMPLAINT FOR UNPAID WAGES against Denver Hotels, LLC, Nilay Patel (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6791064)Attorney Brandt Powers Milstein added to party Ana Lobatos(pty:pla), filed by Ana Lobatos. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Milstein, Brandt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lobatos v. Denver Hotels, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ana Lobatos
Represented By: Brandt Powers Milstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nilay Patel
Represented By: Nadia Hafeez Patrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denver Hotels, LLC
Represented By: Nadia Hafeez Patrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?