Lasser v. Charter Communications, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Mark Lasser
Defendant: Peter Brown and Charter Communications, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv02045
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Michael E Hegarty
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12102
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 COURTROOM MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Status Conference held on 9/5/2019. ORDERED: The #19 Joint MOTION to Vacate and Reset the Scheduling Conference and Deadline to Consent to Magistrate Judge is GRANTED IN PART, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Consent form due by September 16, 2019. FTR: A501. (cthom, )
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 8/29/2019 re: #19 Joint MOTION to Vacate and Reset the Scheduling Conference and Deadline to Consent to Magistrate Judge filed by Charter Communications, Inc., Peter Brown. Status Conference set for 9/5/2019 10:15 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (tsher, )
August 29, 2019 Filing 19 Joint MOTION to Vacate and Reset the Scheduling Conference and Deadline to Consent to Magistrate Judge by Defendants Peter Brown, Charter Communications, Inc.. (Kirkpatrick, Joshua)
August 26, 2019 Filing 18 REPLY to Response to #11 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Defendants Peter Brown, Charter Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 6, #2 Exhibit 7, #3 Exhibit 8, #4 Exhibit 9, #5 Exhibit 10, #6 Exhibit 11, #7 Exhibit 12, #8 Declaration of Dan Vasey)(Kirkpatrick, Joshua)
August 26, 2019 Filing 17 REPLY to Response to #10 MOTION to Dismiss Peter Brown filed by Defendants Peter Brown, Charter Communications, Inc.. (Kirkpatrick, Joshua)
August 26, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Grace LaVance McGuire on behalf of Peter Brown, Charter Communications, Inc.Attorney Grace LaVance McGuire added to party Peter Brown(pty:dft), Attorney Grace LaVance McGuire added to party Charter Communications, Inc.(pty:dft) (McGuire, Grace)
August 12, 2019 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT re #14 Response to Motion to Compel Arbitration by Plaintiff Mark Lasser. (Wesoky, Jason)
August 12, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE to #11 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Plaintiff Mark Lasser. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Mark Lasser)(Wesoky, Jason)
August 12, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE to #10 MOTION to Dismiss Peter Brown filed by Plaintiff Mark Lasser. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Response to MTD, #2 Exhibit B to Response to MTD, #3 Exhibit C to Response to MTD)(Wesoky, Jason)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER At the request of the parties, the Scheduling Conference currently set for September 4, 2019 is vacated and rescheduled to September 20, 2019, at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom A-501, on the fifth floor of the Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse located at 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado. ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 8/1/2019. (cthom, )
July 22, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Defendants Peter Brown, Charter Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Declaration of Tammie Knapper and Exhibits)(Kirkpatrick, Joshua)
July 22, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss Peter Brown by Defendants Peter Brown, Charter Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Kirkpatrick, Joshua)
July 16, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by David J. Marcus on behalf of Mark LasserAttorney David J. Marcus added to party Mark Lasser(pty:pla) (Marcus, David)
July 16, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jason Bryan Wesoky on behalf of Mark LasserAttorney Jason Bryan Wesoky added to party Mark Lasser(pty:pla) (Wesoky, Jason)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 07/16/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 9/4/2019 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (mdave, )
July 15, 2019 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (rsams, )
July 15, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Summons and Complaint upon Charter Communications, Inc. on June 24, 2019. (rsams, )
July 15, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Peter Brown, Charter Communications, Inc., filed by Mark Lasser.(rsams, )
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry. (rsams, )
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (rsams, )
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Peter Brown, Charter Communications, Inc. from Denver District Court, Case Number 2019cv32398. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-6791776), filed by Peter Brown, Charter Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Summons, #3 Exhibit C - Waiver of Service, #4 Exhibit D - Delay Reduction Order, #5 Exhibit E - State Ct. Registry of Actions, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kirkpatrick, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lasser v. Charter Communications, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Brown
Represented By: Joshua B. Kirkpatrick
Represented By: Grace LaVance McGuire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charter Communications, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua B. Kirkpatrick
Represented By: Grace LaVance McGuire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Lasser
Represented By: Jason Bryan Wesoky
Represented By: David J. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?