Lucero et al v. San Luis & Rio Grande Railroad, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Andrew Lucero and Nikole Lucero
Defendant: San Luis & Rio Grande Railroad, Inc. and Michael Ortiz
Case Number: 1:2019cv02070
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Philip A Brimmer
Referring Judge: Kathleen M Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 AMENDED ORDER SETTING Scheduling Conference for 11/25/2019 09:30 AM in Courtroom 101 (Colorado Springs) before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 09/03/2019. (ksena)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER granting #11 Motion to Continue Scheduling Conference. The Scheduling Conference set for 9/23/2019 is vacated, to be reset by separate order. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 9/3/19. Text Only Entry(kmtlc1 )
August 30, 2019 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM regarding #11 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference filed by Andrew Lucero, Nikole Lucero. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 8/30/19. Text Only Entry (pabsec)
August 30, 2019 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference by Plaintiffs Andrew Lucero, Nikole Lucero. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Continue Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference)(Weeks, Jeffrey)
August 14, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Michael Ortiz.(Falls, Gregory)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER STRIKING #8 Answer to Complaint filed by Michael Ortiz, for failure to comply with D.C.COLO.LCivR 10.1(e) ("All pleadings and documents shall be double spaced."). Defendant Michael Ortiz may refile a complying Answer on or before August 15, 2019. By Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 8/14/19. Text Only Entry (pabsec)
August 14, 2019 Filing 8 STRICKEN Defendant Michael Ortiz's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand Attorney Gregory Keith Falls added to party Michael Ortiz(pty:dft) by Michael Ortiz.(Falls, Gregory) Modified on 8/14/2019 to add text STRICKEN per Docket No. 9 (pabsec).
July 26, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Andrew Lucero, Nikole Lucero. Michael Ortiz served on 7/24/2019, answer due 8/14/2019. (Weeks, Jeffrey)
July 26, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Andrew Lucero, Nikole Lucero. San Luis & Rio Grande Railroad, Inc. served on 7/19/2019, answer due 8/9/2019. (Weeks, Jeffrey)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 9/23/2019 10:45 AM in Courtroom 101 (Colorado Springs) before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 07/22/2019. (ksena)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya for non-dispositive matters. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, and (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. By Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 7/18/19. Text Only Entry (pabsec)
July 18, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (rsams, )
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry. (rsams, )
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and JURY DEMAND against Michael Ortiz, San Luis & Rio Grande Railroad, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6795754)Attorney Jeffrey Lenn Weeks added to party Andrew Lucero(pty:pla), Attorney Jeffrey Lenn Weeks added to party Nikole Lucero(pty:pla), filed by Andrew Lucero, Nikole Lucero. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons to San Luis & Rio Grande Railroad, Inc., #3 Summons Summons to Michael Ortiz)(Weeks, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lucero et al v. San Luis & Rio Grande Railroad, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Luis & Rio Grande Railroad, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Ortiz
Represented By: Gregory Keith Falls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Lucero
Represented By: Jeffrey Lenn Weeks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nikole Lucero
Represented By: Jeffrey Lenn Weeks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?