Heft v. Experian Information Solutions Inc
Plaintiff: Kristie Heft
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions Inc
Case Number: 1:2019cv02074
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: S Kato Crews
Referring Judge: Raymond P Moore
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Leave to appeal telephonically. Defense Counsel, Ryan Ho Wai Chan, may appear at the scheduling conference telephonically by calling 303.335.2124 at the scheduled time. By Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 9/9/2019. Text Only Entry(skclc1)
September 9, 2019 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM regarding #18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically at the Scheduling Conference filed by Experian Information Solutions Inc, Experian plc. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Entered by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 9/9/2019. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
September 6, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically at the Scheduling Conference by Defendant Experian Information Solutions Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Chan, Ryan)
September 3, 2019 Filing 17 Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Kristie Heft. (Osborne, Matthew)
August 19, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information by Robyn Berger Averbach (Averbach, Robyn)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER: Due to an unforeseen conflict on the Court's calendar, the Scheduling Conference is RESET for 9/19/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. By Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 8/5/2019. Text Only Entry (skclc1)
July 26, 2019 Filing 14 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Experian Information Solutions Inc All parties do not consent.. (Chan, Ryan)
July 26, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Ryan Ho Wai Chan on behalf of Experian Information Solutions IncAttorney Ryan Ho Wai Chan added to party Experian Information Solutions Inc(pty:dft) (Chan, Ryan)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER Setting Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference set for 9/10/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. The parties shall file their proposed scheduling order, and email a copy in Word format to Crews_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, on or before 9/3/2019. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 7/19/19. Text Only Entry (amont, )
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER: With the assignment of this matter, the parties are advised that throughout this case they are expected to be familiar and comply with not only the Local Rules of this District, but also Judge Raymond P. Moore's Civil Practice Standards, which may be found at: http://www.cod.uscourts.gov/JudicialOfficers/ActiveArticleIIIJudges/HonRaymondPMoore.aspx. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 7/19/2019. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order, and (5) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. Entered by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 7/19/2019. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
July 18, 2019 Filing 9 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Plaintiff Kristie Heft. (Osborne, Matthew)
July 18, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Matthew Ross Osborne on behalf of Kristie HeftAttorney Matthew Ross Osborne added to party Kristie Heft(pty:pla) (Osborne, Matthew)
July 17, 2019 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (cmadr, )
July 17, 2019 Filing 6 Case assigned to Judge Raymond P. Moore and drawn to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
July 17, 2019 Filing 5 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (cmadr, )
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc.'s ANSWER to Plaintiff's #3 Complaint by Experian Information Solutions Inc.(cmadr, )
July 17, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT Under Simplified Civil Procedure against Experian Information Solutions Inc, filed by Kristie Heft.(cmadr, )
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Experian plc for Experian Information Solutions Inc. (Averbach, Robyn)
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Experian Information Solutions Inc from County Court Arapahoe County, Colorado, Case Number 2019C040442. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-6796315), filed by Experian Information Solutions Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Register of Actions, #2 Exhibit Complaint, #3 Exhibit Summons, #4 Exhibit Mediation Order, #5 Exhibit Answer, #6 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet (Federal), #7 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet - Supplemental (Federal))(Averbach, Robyn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heft v. Experian Information Solutions Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions Inc
Represented By: Robyn Berger Averbach
Represented By: Ryan Ho Wai Chan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristie Heft
Represented By: Matthew Ross Osborne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?