Sports Rehab Consulting LLC et al v. Vail Clinic Inc.
Plaintiff: Sports Rehab Consulting LLC and Lindsay Winninger
Defendant: Vail Clinic Inc dba Vail Health and Vail Clinic, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv02075
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Referring Judge: William J Martinez
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Daniel Alexander Richards on behalf of Vail Clinic, Inc.Attorney Daniel Alexander Richards added to party Vail Clinic, Inc.(pty:dft) (Richards, Daniel)
August 29, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Janet Ann Savage on behalf of Vail Clinic, Inc.Attorney Janet Ann Savage added to party Vail Clinic, Inc.(pty:dft) (Savage, Janet)
August 27, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Alan L. Kildow on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Alan L. Kildow added to party Sports Rehab Consulting LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Alan L. Kildow added to party Lindsay Winninger(pty:pla) (Kildow, Alan)
August 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER: The Court finds that it is in the interest of justice to grant Defendants motion for additional time to answer or otherwise respond to the complaintsuch responsive pleading is due no later than September 23, 2019. by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 8/25/2019. Text Only Entry (GPG)
August 23, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE to #13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, as filed by Defendant Vail Clinic filed by Plaintiff Sports Rehab Consulting LLC. (Wiens, Jesse)
August 23, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Related Cases Under D.C.Colo.L.Civ.R. 3.2 by Defendant Vail Clinic, Inc. (Roeder, Jacqueline)
August 23, 2019 Filing 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Roeder, Jacqueline)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting (in part and taking under advisement in part) #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond All Defendants. The Court preliminarily grants Defendant a seven (7) day extension, up to and including August 30, 2019, to answer or otherwise file a responsive pleading to the complaint. Plaintiff SHALL respond to this motion no later than 8/26/2019 and address specifically why a longer extension is not warranted based on the record set forth in Defendants motion. by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 8/22/2019. Text Only Entry(GPG)
August 22, 2019 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM regarding #13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, filed by Vail Clinic, Inc.. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher by Judge William J. Martinez on 8/22/2019. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
August 22, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Vail Clinic, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Roeder, Jacqueline)
August 19, 2019 Filing 12 DISREGARD - FILED IN ERROR SUPPLEMENT/AMENDMENT TO JOINT STATUS REPORT DETAILING PENDING CAUSES OF ACTION by Plaintiff Lindsay Winninger. (Wiens, Jesse) Modified on 8/21/2019filed in error - should have been filed in State Court (angar, ).
August 12, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lindsay Winninger. Sports Rehab Consulting LLC served on 8/2/2019, answer due 8/23/2019. (Wiens, Jesse)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Due to re-assignment, Scheduling Conference which had been set for 10/15/2019 at 10:00 AM with Magistrate Judge Neureiter is hereby Vacated and re-set for 10/15/2019 at 9:00 AM in Room 323 (Grand Junction) before Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher.By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on July 22, 2019. A Scheduling Conference is set in GRAND JUNCTION, Colorado at the Wayne Aspinall Federal Building - United States Courthouse, 400 Rood Avenue, Grand Junction, CO 81501 before U.S. Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. The parties shall comply with the Instructions to Scheduling Order for U.S. Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher which can be found at www.cod.uscourts.gov. Parties concerned regarding travel time and expense to Grand Junction for appearances before the Magistrate Judge are referred to this Magistrate Judge's policy in that regard which can be found at the above website. Text Only Entry (gpgsec )
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 7/19/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 10/15/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom C205 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. (tsher, )
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: This matter has its factual nexus in Eagle County. According to the Court's Revised Jury Plan for Random Jury Selection, this case is therefore properly designated for Jury Division 3. Because the jury will be drawn from that Division, it is appropriate that the case be managed, for pretrial purposes, by Magistrate Judge Gallagher in Grand Junction. Accordingly, pursuant to D.C. Colo. L. Civ. R. 40.1(a), and as approved by the Chief Judge of the Court, the undersigned directs that the Clerk of the Court reassign this action to Magistrate Judge Gallagher as the referral judge. All further pleadings in this case shall reflect the case number of 19-cv-2075-WJM-GPG. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 7/19/2019. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Counsel for the parties and all counsel who may later enter an appearance shall review and familiarize themselves with the undersigned's Revised Practice Standards (as most recently revised effective December 1, 2018 and as they may be amended from time to time), which may be downloaded #here. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 7/ 18/2019. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Magistrate Judge Neureiter, or such other Magistrate Judge who may in the future be reassigned to this case, is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 72(a) and (b). ALSO ORDERED that unless service has otherwise been completed or arranged, Plaintiff's counsel is directed to effect service of the summons and complaint pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure no later than 30 days from the date of this Referral Order, in order for the initial scheduling conference to be held promptly. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the Magistrate Judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 7/18/2019. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
July 18, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (rvill, )
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Judge William J. Martinez and drawn to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
July 17, 2019 Filing 3 SUPPLEMENT/AMENDMENT to #1 Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet by Plaintiffs Sports Rehab Consulting LLC, Lindsay Winninger. (Wiens, Jesse)
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Vail Clinic dba Vail Health by Plaintiffs Sports Rehab Consulting LLC, Lindsay Winninger. (Wiens, Jesse)
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6796558)Attorney Jesse L. Wiens added to party Sports Rehab Consulting LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Jesse L. Wiens added to party Lindsay Winninger(pty:pla), filed by Sports Rehab Consulting LLC, Lindsay Winninger.(Wiens, Jesse)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sports Rehab Consulting LLC et al v. Vail Clinic Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sports Rehab Consulting LLC
Represented By: Jesse L. Wiens
Represented By: Alan L. Kildow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lindsay Winninger
Represented By: Jesse L. Wiens
Represented By: Alan L. Kildow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vail Clinic Inc dba Vail Health
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vail Clinic, Inc.
Represented By: Janet Ann Savage
Represented By: Jacqueline Ventre Roeder
Represented By: Daniel Alexander Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?