USA v. $99,633.00 in United States Currency
Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: $99,633.00 in United States Currency
Claimant: Aaron Vigil
Case Number: 1:2019cv02085
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Kristen L Mix
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 9/3/19 re: #13 Notice of Settlement with Claimant Aaron Vigil by USA. As of the date of this Minute Order, only Mr. Vigil has filed a verified claim asserting an interest in the defendant currency. Claim [#10]. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall file dismissal papers on or before September 23, 2019. (nmarb, )
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER OF REFERENCE. Pursuant to the consent of the parties to the jurisdiction of the magistrate judge #12 , this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix for all purposes pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 9/3/19. Text Only Entry (pabsec)
August 23, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Settlement with Claimant Aaron Vigil by Plaintiff USA (Young, Elizabeth)
August 23, 2019 Filing 12 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff USA All parties consent.. (Young, Elizabeth)
August 3, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Lynn C. Hartfield on behalf of $99,633.00 in United States CurrencyAttorney Lynn C. Hartfield added to party $99,633.00 in United States Currency(pty:dft) (Hartfield, Lynn)
August 3, 2019 Filing 10 CLAIM by Defendant $99,633.00 in United States Currency. (Eichner, Kenneth)
August 3, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kenneth Frank Eichner on behalf of $99,633.00 in United States CurrencyAttorney Kenneth Frank Eichner added to party $99,633.00 in United States Currency(pty:dft) (Eichner, Kenneth)
July 23, 2019 Filing 8 WARRANT For Arrest of Property In Rem issued. (nmarb, )
July 22, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Complaint for Forfeiture by Plaintiff USA (Young, Elizabeth)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER FOR WARRANT for Arrest of Property In Rem, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 7/19/19. (nmarb, )
July 19, 2019 Filing 5 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #4 Order of Recusal. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Kristen L. Mix. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-02085-KLM. (Text Only Entry) (tsher, )
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF RECUSAL by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 7/19/2019. The Clerk of the Court shall cause this case to be reassigned to another Magistrate Judge. (tsher, )
July 19, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (cmadr, )
July 19, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE IN REM against $99,633.00 in United States Currency Attorney Elizabeth Jane Young added to party USA(pty:pla), filed by USA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only), #2 Warrant for Arrest of Property, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Young, Elizabeth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. $99,633.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $99,633.00 in United States Currency
Represented By: Lynn C. Hartfield
Represented By: Kenneth Frank Eichner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Elizabeth Jane Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Aaron Vigil
Represented By: Lynn C. Hartfield
Represented By: Kenneth Frank Eichner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?