Thurimella et al v. Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The
Plaintiff: Ramakrishna Thurimella and Smitha Thurimella
Defendant: Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The
Case Number: 1:2019cv02086
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Raymond P Moore
Referring Judge: Scott T Varholak
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 9/16/19. (morti, )
September 16, 2019 Filing 20 MINUTE ENTRY for Scheduling Conference held before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 9/16/2019. Discovery due by 4/16/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 5/18/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/20/2020 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. FTR: 402. (morti, )
September 9, 2019 Filing 19 Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendant Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The. (Koehler, Jonathan)
September 3, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by William Ryan Walls on behalf of Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, TheAttorney William Ryan Walls added to party Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The(pty:dft) (Walls, William)
July 25, 2019 Filing 17 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The All parties do not consent.. (Koehler, Jonathan)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 9/16/2019 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Proposed Scheduling Order due 9/9/2019, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 7/24/2019. (jgonz, )
July 24, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to #6 Complaint Separate and Affirmative Defenses and Jury Demand by Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The.(Koehler, Jonathan)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER: With the assignment of this matter, the parties are advised that throughout this case they are expected to be familiar and comply with not only the Local Rules of this District, but also Judge Raymond P. Moore's Civil Practice Standards, which may be found at: http://www.cod.uscourts.gov/JudicialOfficers/ActiveArticleIIIJudges/HonRaymondPMoore.aspx. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 7/22/2019. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order, and (5) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. Entered by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 7/22/2019. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
July 19, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jonathan Shawn Sar on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Jonathan Shawn Sar added to party Ramakrishna Thurimella(pty:pla), Attorney Jonathan Shawn Sar added to party Smitha Thurimella(pty:pla) (Sar, Jonathan)
July 19, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Sean Bradley Leventhal on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Sean Bradley Leventhal added to party Ramakrishna Thurimella(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Bradley Leventhal added to party Smitha Thurimella(pty:pla) (Leventhal, Sean)
July 19, 2019 Filing 10 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (rvill, )
July 19, 2019 Filing 9 Case assigned to Judge Raymond P. Moore and drawn to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
July 19, 2019 Filing 8 STATE COURT ORDER Granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Signed by Arapahoe County District Court Judge Frederick Martinez on July 8, 2019. (rvill, )
July 19, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN of Service of Summons and Complaint upon The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company on 06/19/2019. (rvill, )
July 19, 2019 Filing 6 COMPLAINT against The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, filed by Smitha Thurimella, and Ramakrishna Thurimella.(rvill, )
July 19, 2019 Filing 5 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (rvill, )
July 19, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent The Travelers Companies, Inc., Corporate Parent The Travelers Indemnity Company, Corporate Parent Travelers Property Casualty Corp., Corporate Parent Travelers Insurance Group Holdings Inc. for The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company. (Koehler, Jonathan)
July 19, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jonathan Thomas Koehler on behalf of The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company (Koehler, Jonathan)
July 19, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Amy M. Samberg on behalf of The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance CompanyAttorney Amy M. Samberg added to party The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Samberg, Amy)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company from District Court, Arapahoe County, Colorado, Case Number 2019CV31408. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-6799450), filed by The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - State Court Summons, #4 Exhibit C - State Court Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Exhibit D - State Court Return of Service, #6 Exhibit E - State Court Div 15 Delay Reduction Order, #7 Exhibit F - State Court Motion for Extension of Time, #8 Exhibit G - State Court Proposed Order on Motion for Extension of Time, #9 Exhibit H - State Court Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time, #10 Exhibit I - State Court Delay Reduction Order, #11 Exhibit J - State Court Register of Actions, #12 Exhibit K - Certificate of Good Standing, #13 Exhibit L - Email communication re domicile)(Koehler, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thurimella et al v. Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramakrishna Thurimella
Represented By: Jonathan Shawn Sar
Represented By: Sean Bradley Leventhal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Smitha Thurimella
Represented By: Jonathan Shawn Sar
Represented By: Sean Bradley Leventhal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The
Represented By: Amy M. Samberg
Represented By: Jonathan Thomas Koehler
Represented By: William Ryan Walls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?