Dickerson v. Board of Trustees of Metropolitan State University of Denver
Plaintiff: David Dickerson
Defendant: Board of Trustees of Metropolitan State University of Denver
Case Number: 1:2019cv02087
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: S Kato Crews
Referring Judge: William J Martinez
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2019 Filing 14 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and Jury Demand by Board of Trustees of Metropolitan State University of Denver.(Kyles, Alison)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Setting Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference. The Scheduling Conference is set for 10/9/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. The parties shall file their proposed scheduling order, and email a copy in Word format to Crews_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, on or before 10/2/2019. The Magistrate Judge Consent Form (ECF. #3-1) is due 10/2/2019. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 8/20/2019. Text Only Entry (skclc2)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. For good cause shown, the Motion is GRANTED. Accordingly, Defendant Board of Trustees of Metropolitan State University of Denver's answer or other responsive pleading is due 9/11/2019. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 8/20/2019. Text Only Entry (skclc2)
August 19, 2019 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM regarding #9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, filed by Board of Trustees of Metropolitan State University of Denver. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews by Judge William J. Martinez on 8/19/2019. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
August 19, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Vincent Edward Morscher on behalf of Board of Trustees of Metropolitan State University of DenverAttorney Vincent Edward Morscher added to party Board of Trustees of Metropolitan State University of Denver(pty:dft) (Morscher, Vincent)
August 19, 2019 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Board of Trustees of Metropolitan State University of Denver. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Kyles, Alison)
August 19, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Alison Faryl Kyles on behalf of Board of Trustees of Metropolitan State University of DenverAttorney Alison Faryl Kyles added to party Board of Trustees of Metropolitan State University of Denver(pty:dft) (Kyles, Alison)
July 22, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED SUMMONS issued by Clerk on 7/22/2019 (angar, )
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Counsel for the parties and all counsel who may later enter an appearance shall review and familiarize themselves with the undersigned's Revised Practice Standards (as most recently revised effective December 1, 2018 and as they may be amended from time to time), which may be downloaded #here. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 7 /19/2019. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Magistrate Judge Crews, or such other Magistrate Judge who may in the future be reassigned to this case, is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 72(a) and (b). ALSO ORDERED that unless service has otherwise been completed or arranged, Plaintiff's counsel is directed to effect service of the summons and complaint pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure no later than 30 days from the date of this Referral Order, in order for the initial scheduling conference to be held promptly. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the Magistrate Judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 7/19/2019. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
July 19, 2019 Filing 4 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES:re: #1 Complaint, filed by attorneyMark S. Bove.Attorney or pro se has used an incorrect signature format in violation of D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(a) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. In the future, the filer must affix the Address of the Attorney or Firm to all future documents.(Text Only Entry) (rroge, )
July 19, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (rroge, )
July 19, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge William J. Martinez and drawn to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry. (rroge, )
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Board of Trustees of Metropolitan State University of Denver (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6799635)Attorney Mark S. Bove added to party David Dickerson(pty:pla), filed by David Dickerson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons)(Bove, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dickerson v. Board of Trustees of Metropolitan State University of Denver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Dickerson
Represented By: Mark S. Bove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Trustees of Metropolitan State University of Denver
Represented By: Alison Faryl Kyles
Represented By: Vincent Edward Morscher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?