Griggs v. Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Kenny G. Griggs
Defendant: Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Interested Party: SSA Noticing and USAO-SS-Noticing
Case Number: 1:2019cv02090
Filed: July 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Robert E Blackburn
Nature of Suit: Social Security - SSID Title XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Danielle Alicia Pedderson on behalf of Commissioner, Social Security AdministrationAttorney Danielle Alicia Pedderson added to party Commissioner, Social Security Administration(pty:dft) (Pedderson, Danielle)
August 16, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by J. Benedict Garcia on behalf of Commissioner, Social Security AdministrationAttorney J. Benedict Garcia added to party Commissioner, Social Security Administration(pty:dft) (Garcia, J.)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Granting #9 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 07/25/2019. (athom, )
July 24, 2019 Filing 9 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. by Plaintiff Kenny G. Griggs. (Culkin, Francis)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER. Plaintiff's Application To Proceed In District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Short Form) [#1 ] is denied without prejudice. If a proper application is not filed within fourteen (14) days of the date of this order, the court shall dismiss this case for failure to pay the filing fee. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 07/22/2019. (athom, )
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REGARDING INSTRUCTIONS FOR JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 07/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Form) (athom, )
July 20, 2019 Filing 6 Utility Setting Deadlines: Commissioner, Social Security Administration answer due 9/18/2019. Text Only Entry (athom, )
July 20, 2019 Filing 5 Administrative Notice: Social Security Case Service. Pursuant to the Letter of Agreement signed by the Clerk, U.S. District Court;U.S. Attorneys Office for the District of Colorado (USAO), and Social Security Administration (SSA), service of the initiating document(s) by the plaintiff to the SSA, the U.S. Attorney General, and USAO in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(i) is not necessary unless the court otherwise orders. A summons is not required and will not be issued. (Text Only Entry) (cmadr, )
July 20, 2019 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (cmadr, )
July 20, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
July 20, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Andrew M. Saul, filed by Kenny G. Griggs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Culkin, Francis)
July 20, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs Attorney Francis K. Culkin added to party Kenny G. Griggs(pty:pla), filed by Kenny G. Griggs.(Culkin, Francis) Modified to correct document type on 7/22/2019 (cmadr, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Griggs v. Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenny G. Griggs
Represented By: Francis K. Culkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Represented By: J. Benedict Garcia
Represented By: Danielle Alicia Pedderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Noticing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: USAO-SS-Noticing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?