Friends of Animals v. Lowney et al
Plaintiff: Friends of Animals
Defendant: Martin Lowney, United States Fish and Wildlife Service and Animal and Plant Health Inspection Service - Wildlife Services
Case Number: 1:2019cv02110
Filed: July 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Robert E Blackburn
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION for Extension of Time by Defendants Animal and Plant Health Inspection Service - Wildlife Services, Martin Lowney, United States Fish and Wildlife Service. (Steiner, Logan)
September 13, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Logan Ann Steiner on behalf of Animal and Plant Health Inspection Service - Wildlife Services, Martin Lowney, United States Fish and Wildlife ServiceAttorney Logan Ann Steiner added to party Animal and Plant Health Inspection Service - Wildlife Services(pty:dft), Attorney Logan Ann Steiner added to party Martin Lowney (pty:dft), Attorney Logan Ann Steiner added to party United States Fish and Wildlife Service(pty:dft) (Steiner, Logan)
August 8, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant(s) United States Fish and Wildlife Service served on 7/24/2019, answer due 9/23/2019. (Harris, Michael)
August 8, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant(s) Animal and Plant Health Inspection Service - Wildlife Services served on 7/24/2019, answer due 9/23/2019. (Harris, Michael)
August 8, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Friends of Animals. Martin Lowney served on 7/24/2019, answer due 8/14/2019. (Harris, Michael)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REGARDING INSTRUCTIONS FOR JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 07/23/2019. (athom, )
July 23, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (cmadr, )
July 23, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
July 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Animal and Plant Health Inspection Service - Wildlife Services, Martin Lowney, United States Fish and Wildlife Service (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6803723)Attorney Michael Ray Harris added to party Friends of Animals(pty:pla), filed by Friends of Animals. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Harris, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Friends of Animals v. Lowney et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin Lowney
Represented By: Logan Ann Steiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Fish and Wildlife Service
Represented By: Logan Ann Steiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Animal and Plant Health Inspection Service - Wildlife Services
Represented By: Logan Ann Steiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Friends of Animals
Represented By: Courtney Renee McVean
Represented By: Michael Ray Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?