Noble Line, Inc. v. Unkefer et al
Plaintiff: Noble Line, Inc.
Defendant: Noble Hemp Company, Arete Arms, LLC and Donald Andrew Unkefer
Case Number: 1:2019cv02253
Filed: August 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Kristen L Mix
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 Filing 13 STIPULATION and Joint Motion for Approval of Stipulation Regarding Settlement by Plaintiff Noble Line, Inc.. (Bruno, Harold)
October 3, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATION and Joint Motion for Approval of Stipulation Regarding Settlement by Plaintiff Noble Line, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Bruno, Harold)
August 30, 2019 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Kass, Jeffrey)
August 30, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Related Cases by Defendants Noble Hemp Company, Donald Andrew Unkefer (Kass, Jeffrey)
August 30, 2019 Filing 9 Defendants Donald Andrew Unkefer and Noble Hemp Company, Inc.'s ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Attorney Jeffrey H. Kass added to party Noble Hemp Company(pty:dft), Attorney Jeffrey H. Kass added to party Donald Andrew Unkefer(pty:dft) by Noble Hemp Company, Donald Andrew Unkefer.(Kass, Jeffrey)
August 19, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT re #1 Complaint, Affidavits of Service by Plaintiff Noble Line, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit)(Bruno, Harold)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 8/12/19, Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 10/15/2019. Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 10/22/2019 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2) (nmarb, )
August 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER. Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(c)(4), the deadline to file the Consent/Non-Consent to United States Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form [#5-2] is October 8, 2019. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 8/11/2019. Text Only Entry (klmlc1, )
August 8, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (agarc, )
August 8, 2019 Filing 4 Report re Patent/Trademark: Report on the filing of an action emailed (NEF) to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (agarc, )
August 8, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Donald Andrew Unkefer, d/b/a Arete Arms, LLC & Noble Hemp Company re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Noble Line, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Bruno, Harold)
August 7, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry. (agarc, )
August 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Trademark Infringement, Unfair Competition, Deceptive Trade Practices, and Anti-Dilution against Noble Line, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6831731)Attorney Harold R. Bruno, III added to party Noble Line, Inc.(pty:pla), filed by Noble Line, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Arete Arms, LLC, #3 Summons Noble Hemp Company)(Bruno, Harold)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Noble Line, Inc. v. Unkefer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noble Hemp Company
Represented By: Jeffrey H. Kass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arete Arms, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Andrew Unkefer
Represented By: Jeffrey H. Kass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noble Line, Inc.
Represented By: Harold R. Bruno, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?