Krasemann v. McGraw-Hill Global Education Holdings, LLC
Plaintiff: Stephen J. Krasemann
Defendant: McGraw-Hill Global Education Holdings, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv02277
Filed: August 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Robert E Blackburn
Referring Judge: Kristen L Mix
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 Filing 13 Civil Case Terminated pursuant to the notice of dismissal or stipulation to dismiss filed in this case Text Only Entry (lgale, )
August 30, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case by Plaintiff Stephen J. Krasemann (Bruss, Amanda)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 10/27/19 Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference. Proposed Scheduling Order due on or before 10/30/2019. Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 11/6/2019 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2) (nmarb, )
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER. Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(c)(4), the deadline to file the Consent/Non-Consent to United States Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form [#9] is October 23, 2019. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 8/27/2019. Text Only Entry (klmlc1, )
August 12, 2019 Filing 9 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (athom, )
August 12, 2019 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Senior Judge Blackburn. This case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-02277-KLM. (athom, )
August 12, 2019 Filing 7 Report re Copyright: Report on the filing of an action emailed separately to the Director of the Copyright Office. (rvill, )
August 12, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (rvill, )
August 9, 2019 Filing 5 Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
August 9, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE re #1 Complaint, Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright by Plaintiff Stephen Krasemann (Bruss, Amanda)
August 9, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS REQUEST as to McGraw-Hill Global Education Holdings, LLC re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Stephen Krasemann. (Bruss, Amanda)
August 9, 2019 Filing 2 Exhibits in Support of #1 Complaint, Civil Coversheet by Plaintiff Stephen Krasemann. (Bruss, Amanda)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against McGraw-Hill Global Education Holdings, LLC (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6835316)Attorney Amanda Leigh Bruss added to party Stephen Krasemann(pty:pla), filed by Stephen Krasemann. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Bruss, Amanda)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Krasemann v. McGraw-Hill Global Education Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McGraw-Hill Global Education Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen J. Krasemann
Represented By: Amanda Leigh Bruss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?