Levey v. Wetherall
Plaintiff: William Levey and William J. Levey
Defendant: Spencer Wetherall, Joseph G d/b/a Wetherall Restoration, d/b/a Classic Car, d/b/a/ Classic Care Restoration Specialist and Spencer Wetherall doing business as Wetherall Restorations doing business as Classic Car doing business as Classic Care Restoration Specialist
Case Number: 1:2019cv02294
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Michael E Hegarty
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER Due to a conflict in the Court's calendar, the Scheduling Conference currently set for October 15, 2019 is vacated and rescheduled to October 23, 2019, at 10:15 a.m. in Courtroom A-501, on the fifth floor of the Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse located at 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado. ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 9/10/2019. (cthom, )
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 8/15/2019.Consent Form due by 9/25/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 10/15/2019 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (tsher, )
August 14, 2019 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (angar, )
August 14, 2019 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE, by Senior Judge Lewis T. Babcock. This case is randomly returned to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-2294-MEH (angar, )
August 13, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (rsams, )
August 12, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock and drawn to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry. (rsams, )
August 12, 2019 Filing 3 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re: #1 Complaint, filed by attorney Joseph G. Webb.The document was scanned and not converted directly to portable document format (PDF). DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 1.3(f) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). (Text Only Entry) (rsams, )
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Spencer Wetherall re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff William Levey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint Exhibirt 1 Contract, #2 Exhibit Complaint Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Complaint Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Complaint Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Compliant Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Complaint Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Complaint Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit Complaint Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit Complaint Exhbit 9, #10 Exhibit Complaint Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit Complaint Exhbiit 12)(Webb, Joseph)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Spencer Wetherall, d/b/a Classic Car, Joseph G d/b/a Wetherall Restoration, d/b/a/ Classic Care Restoration Specialist (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6838071)Attorney Joseph G. Webb added to party William Levey(pty:pla), filed by William Levey. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Webb, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Levey v. Wetherall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spencer Wetherall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph G d/b/a Wetherall Restoration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: d/b/a Classic Car
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: d/b/a/ Classic Care Restoration Specialist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spencer Wetherall doing business as Wetherall Restorations doing business as Classic Car doing business as Classic Care Restoration Specialist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Levey
Represented By: Joseph G. Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William J. Levey
Represented By: Joseph G. Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?