Allman v. Barr et al
Plaintiff: Frederick L. Allman
Defendant: Petter C. McKittrick, S. Amanda Marshall, Arnot Stephen, Clifford J. White III, Joseph Lamonica, William P. Barr, Michelle H. Kerin, Kenneth S. Eiler, M. Vivienne Popperl, Billy J. Williams and Stephen Arnot
Case Number: 1:2019cv02300
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Lewis T Babcock
Referring Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Civil Rights (U.S. not a defendant)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Filing 8 RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 10/7/2019, re: #1 Malicious Prosecution and Civil Rights Conspiracy Verified Prima Facie Complaint, filed by Frederick L. Allman. (sphil, )
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF REFERENCE to the United States Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 10/3/2019. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-02300-LTB-GPG. (sphil, )
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 10/2/2019. Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 8.1, the Clerk of Court is directed to assign thismatter to Senior Judge Lewis T. Babcock. The undersigned will remain as the assigned magistrate judge. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-02300-LTB. (sphil, )
September 9, 2019 Filing 5 RESPONSE to #4 Order to Show Cause, by Plaintiff Frederick L. Allman. (sphil, )
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 8/14/2019. ORDERED that Plaintiff show cause, in writing, within 30 days from the date of this Order, why this action should not be dismissed or transferred for improper venue. ORDERED that if Plaintiff fails to show cause by the deadline, this action will be dismissed without further notice. The dismissal shall be without prejudice. (sphil, )
August 12, 2019 Filing 3 Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915. by Plaintiff Frederick L. Allman. (rsams, )
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (rsams, )
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 Malicious Prosecution and Civil Rights Conspiracy against William P. Barr, Kenneth S. Eiler, Michelle H. Kerin, Joseph Lamonica, S. Amanda Marshall, Petter C. McKittrick, M. Vivienne Popperl, Arnot Stephen, Clifford J. White III, Billy J. Williams(Former Assistant USA District of Oregon), Billy J. Williams(USAO, Department of Justice, United States), filed by Frederick L. Allman. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Envelope)(rsams, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allman v. Barr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Petter C. McKittrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Amanda Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arnot Stephen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clifford J. White III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Lamonica
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William P. Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle H. Kerin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth S. Eiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Vivienne Popperl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Billy J. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Arnot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frederick L. Allman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?