Bankers Standard Insurance Company v. Kalvar et al
Plaintiff: Bankers Standard Insurance Company
Defendant: Daniel Kalvar, Loch Lomond CM, LLC d/b/a The Intrigue Auto, Loch Lomond CM, LLC, Craig Clark and Green Mountain Holdings LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv02311
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Nina Y Wang
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Filing 19 (Alias) SUMMONS issued by Clerk to Daniel Klavar. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (nmarb, )
October 8, 2019 Filing 18 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Daniel Kalvar by Plaintiff Bankers Standard Insurance Company. (Ostojic, B.)
September 26, 2019 Filing 17 SUMMONS issued by Clerk to Green Mountain Holdings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons issued to Craig Clark, #2 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (nmarb, )
September 25, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Craig Clark d/b/a The Intrigue Auto Club by Plaintiff Bankers Standard Insurance Company. (Ostojic, B.)
September 25, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Green Mountain Holdings LLC d/b/a The Intrigue Auto Club by Plaintiff Bankers Standard Insurance Company. (Ostojic, B.)
September 23, 2019 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Daniel Kalvar, Loch Lomond CM, LLC, Green Mountain Holdings LLC, Craig Clark, filed by Bankers Standard Insurance Company.(nmarb, )
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER construing #12 Motion for Leave as Plaintiff's Notice of Filing an Amended Pleading as a matter of course pursuant to Rule 15(a)(1)(A) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 15.1(a) by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 9/23/2019. Accordingly, the Clerk of the Court shall accept and file the First Amended Complaint [#12-1] as a separate filing on the court's docket. Text Only Entry(nywlc2, )
September 19, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Bankers Standard Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed First Amended Complaint)(Ostojic, B.)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 9/16/19 DISCHARGING #8 Order to Show Cause and Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference, and Setting Deadline for Filing of Consent/Nonconsent Form. Consent Form due by 10/16/2019. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 10/23/2019. Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 10/30/2019 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. (nmarb, )
September 13, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bankers Standard Insurance Company. Loch Lomond CM, LLC served on 9/6/2019, answer due 9/27/2019. (Ostojic, B.)
September 13, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #8 by Plaintiff Bankers Standard Insurance Company. (Ostojic, B.)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 9/3/19 returnable by Plaintiff, as to why this case should not be dismissed for lack of federal subject matter jurisdiction. Show Cause Response due by 9/17/2019. (nmarb, ) Modified on 9/17/2019 to show as DISCHARGED pursuant to #11 Order. (nmarb, ).
August 20, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (tsher, )
August 14, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (rvill, )
August 14, 2019 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
August 14, 2019 Filing 4 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number COX091568. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
August 14, 2019 Filing 3 Administrative Notice: No filing fee received with case opening. Attorney contacted with instructions to submit filing fee within 3 hours. (Text Only Entry) (rvill, )
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Daniel Kalvar re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Bankers Standard Insurance Company. (Ostojic, B.)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Daniel Kalvar, Loch Lomond CM, LLC d/b/a The Intrigue Auto (Filing fee $ 400).Attorney B. Robert Ostojic added to party Bankers Standard Insurance Company(pty:pla), filed by Bankers Standard Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Ostojic, B.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bankers Standard Insurance Company v. Kalvar et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bankers Standard Insurance Company
Represented By: B. Robert Ostojic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Kalvar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loch Lomond CM, LLC d/b/a The Intrigue Auto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loch Lomond CM, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Green Mountain Holdings LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?