Bursey v. Cushman & Wakefield, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Patrick Bursey
Defendant: Cushman & Wakefield of Colorado, Inc. and Cushman & Wakefield, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv02344
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Michael E Hegarty
Referring Judge: R Brooke Jackson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER TO SET SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: This matter comes before the Court sua sponte. In light of the decline of consent to a magistrate judge by one or more of the parties in this case and its reassignment to this Court, the Scheduling Conference set October 17, 2018 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty is VACATED. The parties are ordered to set an initial scheduling conference in this Court (with Judge Jackson) pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.1. The parties are directed to jointly contact Chambers by telephone at (303) 844-4694 or by email at Jackson_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov to obtain a scheduling conference date within 14 days of the date of this order. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 9/30/19. (rbjsec. )
September 27, 2019 Filing 16 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #14 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge R. Brooke Jackson. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-02344-RBJ. (Text Only Entry) (tsher, )
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER re: #14 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge filed by Cushman & Wakefield, Inc., Cushman & Wakefield of Colorado, Inc. by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 9/27/2019. Parties do not consent. The Court directs the Clerk of the Court to reassign this case under D.C. Colo. LCivR 40.1(a). (tsher, )
September 27, 2019 Filing 14 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendants Cushman & Wakefield of Colorado, Inc., Cushman & Wakefield, Inc. All parties do not consent.. (Montani, Sadina)
September 16, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Cushman & Wakefield of Colorado, Inc., Cushman & Wakefield, Inc..(Montani, Sadina)
September 10, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Brendan G. Dolan on behalf of Cushman & Wakefield of Colorado, Inc., Cushman & Wakefield, Inc.Attorney Brendan G. Dolan added to party Cushman & Wakefield of Colorado, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Brendan G. Dolan added to party Cushman & Wakefield, Inc.(pty:dft) (Dolan, Brendan)
September 10, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Thomas W. Snyder on behalf of Cushman & Wakefield of Colorado, Inc., Cushman & Wakefield, Inc.Attorney Thomas W. Snyder added to party Cushman & Wakefield of Colorado, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas W. Snyder added to party Cushman & Wakefield, Inc.(pty:dft) (Snyder, Thomas)
September 9, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Related Cases by Defendants Cushman & Wakefield of Colorado, Inc., Cushman & Wakefield, Inc. (Dolan, Brendan)
September 9, 2019 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Cushman & Wakefield, Inc. for Cushman & Wakefield of Colorado, Inc.. (Montani, Sadina)
September 9, 2019 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent C&W Group, Inc. for Cushman & Wakefield, Inc.. (Montani, Sadina)
September 9, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendants Cushman & Wakefield of Colorado, Inc., Cushman & Wakefield, Inc.. Cushman & Wakefield of Colorado, Inc. answer due 9/16/2019; Cushman & Wakefield, Inc. answer due 9/16/2019. (Montani, Sadina)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 8/16/2019. Consent Form due by 9/27/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 10/17/2019 10:15 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (tsher, )
August 16, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (cmadr, )
August 16, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
August 16, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Cushman & Wakefield, Inc. by Plaintiff Patrick Bursey. (Neuman, John)
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Cushman & Wakefield of Colorado, Inc. by Plaintiff Patrick Bursey. (Neuman, John)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cushman & Wakefield of Colorado, Inc., Cushman & Wakefield, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6846721)Attorney John A. Neuman added to party Patrick Bursey(pty:pla), filed by Patrick Bursey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent Form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Neuman, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bursey v. Cushman & Wakefield, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Bursey
Represented By: John A. Neuman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cushman & Wakefield of Colorado, Inc.
Represented By: Sadina Montani
Represented By: Brendan G. Dolan
Represented By: Thomas W. Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cushman & Wakefield, Inc.
Represented By: Sadina Montani
Represented By: Brendan G. Dolan
Represented By: Thomas W. Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?