Cranford v. Centura Health Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Susan Cranford
Defendant: Centura Health Corporation, Catholic Health Initiatives Colorado and Catholic Health Initiatives Colorado a Colorado corporation doing business as Catholic Health Initiatives Mountain Region doing business as St. Mary-Corwin Medical Center
Case Number: 1:2019cv02350
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Philip A Brimmer
Referring Judge: Kathleen M Tafoya
Nature of Suit: FMLA
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2615
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2019 Filing 23 Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Susan Cranford. (Xu, Tina)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MINUTE ORDER granting #20 Motion for Parties to Appear by Telephone. The parties shall initiate a conference call and contact chambers, 719-575-0328, at the scheduled time. The parties shall use a LAND LINE; NO CELLULAR, CORDLESS OR SPEAKER PHONES ARE PERMITTED. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 10/02/19. Text Only Entry(kmtlc2)
October 2, 2019 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM regarding #20 Joint MOTION for Leave to Appear by Telephone at the October 21, 2019 Scheduling Conference filed by Susan Cranford. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 10/2/19. Text Only Entry (pabsec)
October 2, 2019 Filing 20 Joint MOTION for Leave to Appear by Telephone at the October 21, 2019 Scheduling Conference by Plaintiff Susan Cranford. (Anderson, Jeanine)
September 30, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Tina Xiao Xu on behalf of Susan CranfordAttorney Tina Xiao Xu added to party Susan Cranford(pty:pla) (Xu, Tina)
September 30, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Richard P. Barkley on behalf of Susan CranfordAttorney Richard P. Barkley added to party Susan Cranford(pty:pla) (Barkley, Richard)
September 30, 2019 Filing 17 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Susan Cranford All parties do not consent.. (Anderson, Jeanine)
September 27, 2019 Filing 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Sabey, Melvin)
September 27, 2019 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Sabey, Melvin)
September 27, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Attorney Melvin B. Sabey added to party Catholic Health Initiatives Colorado(pty:dft), Attorney Melvin B. Sabey added to party Centura Health Corporation(pty:dft) by Catholic Health Initiatives Colorado, Centura Health Corporation.(Sabey, Melvin)
September 11, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Susan Cranford. Catholic Health Initiatives Colorado served on 9/6/2019, answer due 9/27/2019. (Anderson, Jeanine)
September 11, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Susan Cranford. Centura Health Corporation served on 9/6/2019, answer due 9/27/2019. (Anderson, Jeanine)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 10/21/2019 10:45 AM in Courtroom 101 (Colorado Springs) before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 08/23/2019. (ksena)
August 21, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (sphil, )
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya for non-dispositive matters. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, and (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. By Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 8/21/19. Text Only Entry (pabsec)
August 19, 2019 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Senior Judge Robert E. Blackburn. This case is randomly reassigned to Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-02350-PAB-KMT. (sphil, )
August 19, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Catholic Health Initiatives Colorado by Plaintiff Susan Cranford. (Anderson, Jeanine)
August 19, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Centura Health Corporation by Plaintiff Susan Cranford. (Anderson, Jeanine)
August 16, 2019 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). No Summons Issued. Summons caption must list all Parties in the action.. Please file completed summons for issuance using the event Summons Request. (cmadr, )
August 16, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
August 16, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Catholic Health Initiatives Colorado by Plaintiff Susan Cranford. (Anderson, Jeanine)
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Centura Health Corporation by Plaintiff Susan Cranford. (Anderson, Jeanine)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Catholic Health Initiatives Colorado, Centura Health Corporation (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6847705)Attorney Jeanine Marie Anderson added to party Susan Cranford(pty:pla), filed by Susan Cranford. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Anderson, Jeanine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cranford v. Centura Health Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centura Health Corporation
Represented By: Melvin B. Sabey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catholic Health Initiatives Colorado
Represented By: Melvin B. Sabey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catholic Health Initiatives Colorado a Colorado corporation doing business as Catholic Health Initiatives Mountain Region doing business as St. Mary-Corwin Medical Center
Represented By: Melvin B. Sabey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Cranford
Represented By: Jeanine Marie Anderson
Represented By: Richard P. Barkley
Represented By: Tina Xiao Xu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?