Bishelli v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: Charlotte Bishelli
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv02356
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: William J Martinez
Referring Judge: N Reid Neureiter
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2019 Filing 16 Interdistrict Transmittal of Documents via e-mail to The Northern District Of California, pursuant to the Certified Copy of the Conditional Transfer Order. ecfhelpdesk@cand.uscourts.gov. Text Only Entry (evana, )
September 25, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-153) from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring from the District of Colorado,19-cv-02356 WJM-NRN, to the Northern District of California, to become part of MDL 2741 by Clerk on 9/25/2019. (evana, )
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 9/4/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 11/7/2019 09:30 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. (tsher, )
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Counsel for the parties and all counsel who may later enter an appearance shall review and familiarize themselves with the undersigned's Revised Practice Standards (as most recently revised effective December 1, 2018 and as they may be amended from time to time), which may be downloaded #here. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 9/ 4/2019. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Magistrate Judge Neureiter, or such other Magistrate Judge who may in the future be reassigned to this case, is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 72(a) and (b). ALSO ORDERED that unless service has otherwise been completed or arranged, Plaintiff's counsel is directed to effect service of the summons and complaint pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure no later than 30 days from the date of this Referral Order, in order for the initial scheduling conference to be held promptly. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the Magistrate Judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 9/4/2019. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: This matter is before the Court on the filing of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint #9 : Based on its review of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, the Court is satisfied it has diversity jurisdiction over this action pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1332. As a consequence, the Order to Show Cause is DISCHARGED. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 9/4/2019. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
September 2, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading re #9 Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Charlotte Bishelli (Attachments: #1 Exhibit First Amended Compliant with Underlines per D.C.Colo.LCivR 15.1(a))(Ochs, Jason)
September 2, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Monsanto Company, filed by Charlotte Bishelli.(Ochs, Jason)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Before the Court is Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint and Jury Demand #7 . Plaintiff's Amended Complaint is STRICKEN for failure to comply with D.C.Colo.L.Civ.R. 15.1(a). Plaintiff is DIRECTED to re-file her Amended Complaint in compliance with the Local Rules no later than September 3, 2019. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 8/30/2019. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
August 21, 2019 Filing 7 STRICKEN AMENDED COMPLAINT against Monsanto Company, filed by Charlotte Bishelli.(Ochs, Jason) Modified on 9/4/2019 to strike pursuant to 8 Order (angar, ).
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE returnable August 28, 2019. The Court has a duty to sua sponte consider its subject matter jurisdiction. Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(h)(3). Plaintiff claims jurisdiction pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1332 based on the diversity of the parties. The Court "must rigorously enforce Congress' intent to restrict federal jurisdiction in controversies between citizens of different states." Martin v. Franklin Capital Corp., 251 F.3d 1284, 1289 (10th Cir. 2001) abrogated on other grounds by Dart Cherokee Basin Operating Co., LLC v. Owens, 135 S. Ct. 547 (2014)). Plaintiff's Complaint lacks any factual allegations which plausibly allege that the amount in controversy exceeds $75,000. See 28 U.S.C. 1332(a). Accordingly, Plaintiff is ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE, by August 28, 2019, as to why the Court should not on its own motion dismiss this action based on Plaintiff's failure to allege facts sufficient to show that the Court has diversity jurisdiction over this matter. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 8/21/2019. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
August 20, 2019 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE, by Senior Judge Lewis T. Babcock. This case is randomly returned to Judge William J. Martinez for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-2356-WJM (angar, )
August 16, 2019 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). No Summons Issued. (cmadr, )
August 16, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock and drawn to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES:re: #1 Complaint filed by attorneyJason Edward Ochs. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - counsel must submit a change of contact request through the Attorney Services Portal Account pursuant to D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(c) and 3.5 of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases).(Text Only Entry) (cmadr, )
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Monsanto Company (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6848221)Attorney Jason Edward Ochs added to party Charlotte Bishelli(pty:pla), filed by Charlotte Bishelli.(Ochs, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bishelli v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlotte Bishelli
Represented By: Jason Edward Ochs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?