Freeman v. Matevousian
Petitioner: Demetrius T. Freeman
Respondent: Matevousian
Case Number: 1:2019cv02365
Filed: August 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER This matter is before the court on the "Letter Motion" (ECF No. #6 ) filed September 30, 2019, in which Applicant indicates he has been transferred to a new facility and seeks additional time to respond to any pending matters. The clerk of the court is directed to mail to Applicant, together with a copy of this Minute Order, a copy of the Minute Order (ECF No. #5 ) entered in this action on September 19, 2019. Applicant shall have thirty (30) days from the date of this Minute Order to cure the remaining deficiency as directed in the September 19 Minute Order. Applicant is reminded that the action will be dismissed without further notice if he fails to cure the remaining deficiency as directed within the time allowed, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 10/1/2019.(Mailed as ordered)(evana, )
September 30, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time and Notice change of contact information, by Petitioner Demetrius T. Freeman. (evana, )
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER. Applicant shall have thirty (30) days from the date of this Minute Order to cure the remaining deficiency. Applicant is reminded that the action will be dismissed without further notice if he fails to cure the remaining deficiency as directed within the time allowed, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 9/19/2019. (angar, )
September 13, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED APPLICATION for Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241, filed by Demetrius T. Freeman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(evana, )
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DIRECTING APPLICANT TO CURE DEFICIENCIES within thirty (30) days from the date of this order. Any papers that Applicant files in response to this order must include the civil action number on this order. That the clerk of the court mail to Applicant, together with a copy of this order, blank copies of the following forms: Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 in a Habeas Corpus Action and Application for a Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241. That, if Applicant fails to cure all of the designated deficiencies within thirty (30) days from the date of this order, the action will be dismissed without further notice. The dismissal shall be without prejudice, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 8/21/2019. (mailed as ordered) (evana, )
August 19, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
August 19, 2019 Filing 1 Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 USC 2241, filed by Demetrius T. Freeman. (Attachments: #1 Letter)(rvill, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Freeman v. Matevousian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Matevousian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Demetrius T. Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?