Associated Bank, National Association v. Timber Creek Holdings LLC et al
Plaintiff: Associated Bank, National Association
Defendant: Timber Creek Operating LLC, Timber Creek Holdings LLC, Timber Creek Services, LLC, Timber Creek Energy LLC and Harley Triumph, LLC
Not Yet Classified: David M. Baker
Case Number: 1:2019cv02377
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: R Brooke Jackson
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance on behalf of David M. Baker, in his capacity as Receiver for Timber Creek Holdings, Inc. by John Patrick Sieger. Modified on 9/16/2019 to correct text (angar, ).
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting in part #6 Motion for Appointment of Receiver by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 9/16/19.(jdyne, )
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER finding as moot #5 Motion to Appoint Receiver. Moot in light of the amended motion filed at ECF No. 6. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 9.16.19. Text Only Entry(rbjsec. )
September 13, 2019 Filing 6 First MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify Emergency Unopposed Verified Motion to Appoint Receiver and Request for Expedited Hearing by Plaintiff Associated Bank, National Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Receiver Credentials, #2 Exhibit Redline of Proposed Order, #3 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Order for Appointment of Receiver)(Dexter, Stephen)
September 10, 2019 Filing 5 Emergency MOTION to Appoint Receiver and Request for Expedited Hearing by Plaintiff Associated Bank, National Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Appointing Receiver, #3 Affidavit Certificate of Service)(Dexter, Stephen)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SET SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: This matter comes before the Court sua sponte. The parties are ordered to set an initial scheduling conference in this Court (with Judge Jackson) pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.1 no later than 45 days after the answer, motion to dismiss or other response to the complaint is filed. The parties are directed to jointly contact Chambers by telephone at (303) 844-4694 or by email at Jackson_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov to obtain a scheduling conference date. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 8/21/19. (rbjsec. )
August 21, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (agarc, )
August 20, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge R. Brooke Jackson and drawn to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry. (agarc, )
August 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Harley Triumph, LLC, Timber Creek Energy LLC, Timber Creek Holdings LLC, Timber Creek Operating LLC, Timber Creek Services, LLC (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6853043)Attorney Stephen Kent Dexter added to party Associated Bank, National Association(pty:pla), filed by Associated Bank, National Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Civil Cover Sheet, #16 Summons to Timber Creek Holdings LLC, #17 Summons to Harley Triumph, LLC, #18 Summons to Timber Creek Services, LLC, #19 Summons to Timber Creek Operating LLC, #20 Summons to Timber Creek Energy LLC)(Dexter, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Associated Bank, National Association v. Timber Creek Holdings LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timber Creek Operating LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timber Creek Holdings LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timber Creek Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timber Creek Energy LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harley Triumph, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Associated Bank, National Association
Represented By: Stephen Kent Dexter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: David M. Baker
Represented By: John Patrick Sieger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?