Kipper v. Masters Millennium, LLC
Plaintiff: Robbie Kipper
Defendant: RE/MAX MASTERS MILLENNIUM and Masters Millennium, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv02389
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Michael E Hegarty
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER re: #8 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge filed by Robbie Kipper. Mr. Ausmus is directed to enter an appearance in this matter on or before October 28, 2019. ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/21/2019. (cthom, )
October 17, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Robbie Kipper All parties consent.. (Green, Sara)
October 17, 2019 Filing 7 Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Robbie Kipper. (Green, Sara)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/8/2019. Proposed Scheduling Order due 10/17/2019. Scheduling Conference is VACATED and RESET to 10/31/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (tsher, )
August 27, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Robbie Kipper. Masters Millennium, LLC waiver sent on 8/27/2019, answer due 10/28/2019. (Green, Sara)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 8/23/2019. Consent Form due by 10/1/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 10/21/2019 10:15 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (tsher, )
August 23, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. No Summons Issued. (rvill, )
August 22, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
August 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against RE/MAX MASTERS MILLENNIUM (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6857102)Attorney Sara Ann Green added to party Robbie Kipper(pty:pla), filed by Robbie Kipper. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Green, Sara)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kipper v. Masters Millennium, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RE/MAX MASTERS MILLENNIUM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Masters Millennium, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robbie Kipper
Represented By: Sara Ann Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?