USA v. Creager
Plaintiff: United States of America and USA
Defendant: Danny L Creager
Case Number: 1:2019cv02411
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Lewis T Babcock
Nature of Suit: Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 26:7401
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2019 Filing 11 DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of USA and against Danny L Creager pursuant to #10 Order on Motion for Default Judgment, by Clerk on 10/11/2019. (ebuch)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 United States' Motion for Default Judgment against Danny L. Creager, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 10/11/2019. (ebuch)
October 10, 2019 Filing 9 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #8 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Danny L. Creager. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-02411-LTB. (Text Only Entry) (tsher, )
October 9, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Danny L. Creager by Plaintiff USA. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Wanda Manley, #2 Exhibit 1 (Forms 4340), #3 Exhibit 2 (INSTDs), #4 Affidavit Declaration of Alex Halverson, #5 Exhibit A (SCRA Status Report), #6 Proposed Document Proposed Default Judgment)(Halverson, Alex)
September 25, 2019 Filing 7 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Danny L Creager, by Clerk. Text Only Entry. (tsher, )
September 24, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Danny L. Creager by Plaintiff USA. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Alex R. Halverson, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Alex R. Halverson)(Halverson, Alex)
September 12, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by USA. Danny L Creager served on 9/2/2019, answer due 9/23/2019. (Halverson, Alex)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 8/26/2019. Consent Form due by 10/22/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 11/5/2019 11:00 AM in Courtroom C205 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. (tsher, )
August 26, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (cmadr, )
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Danny L Creager Attorney Alex Ryan Halverson added to party United States of America(pty:pla), filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Halverson, Alex)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Creager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danny L Creager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Alex Ryan Halverson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Alex Ryan Halverson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?