Savard et al v. McAleenan et al
Plaintiff: Ms. Norah Elizabeth Savard and Norah Savard
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Act DHS Sec. Kevin MCALEENAN, Acting Director Kenneth Cuccinelli, Meghan Savard, Kenneth Cuccinelli, Kevin McAleenan and U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Case Number: 1:2019cv02432
Filed: August 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Lewis T Babcock
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 10/17/2019. The Scheduling conference set for 10/30/2019 at 10:00 is VACATED. PLEASE READ ATTACHED MINUTE ORDER. (tsher, )
October 16, 2019 Filing 19 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #18 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-02432-LTB. (Text Only Entry) (tsher, )
October 16, 2019 Filing 18 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Norah Savard All parties do not consent.. (Knudson, Kristin)
October 10, 2019 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION to Vacate Scheduling Conference by Defendants Kenneth Cuccinelli, Kevin McAleenan, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. (Kellogg, Ian)
October 4, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Ian J. Kellogg on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Ian J. Kellogg added to party Kenneth Cuccinelli(pty:dft), Attorney Ian J. Kellogg added to party Kevin McAleenan(pty:dft), Attorney Ian J. Kellogg added to party U.S. Department of Homeland Security(pty:dft), Attorney Ian J. Kellogg added to party United States Citizenship and Immigration Services(pty:dft) (Kellogg, Ian)
September 11, 2019 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT /Proof of Service on Attorney General Barr by Plaintiff Norah Savard. (Knudson, Kristin)
September 11, 2019 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT /Proof of Service on U.S. Attorney Jason Dunn by Plaintiff Norah Savard. (Knudson, Kristin)
September 10, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant(s) Kevin McAleenan served on 8/30/2019, answer due 10/29/2019. (Knudson, Kristin)
September 10, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant(s) Kenneth Cuccinelli served on 9/4/2019, answer due 11/4/2019. (Knudson, Kristin)
September 10, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant(s) U.S. Department of Homeland Security served on 9/4/2019, answer due 11/4/2019. (Knudson, Kristin)
September 10, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant(s) United States Citizenship and Immigration Services served on 9/4/2019, answer due 11/4/2019. (Knudson, Kristin)
September 3, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONSES issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (tsher, )
August 30, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS REQUEST as to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services re #2 Complaint,, by Plaintiffs M.S.1, Norah Savard. (Knudson, Kristin)
August 30, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Department of Homeland Security re #2 Complaint,, by Plaintiffs M.S.1, Norah Savard. (Knudson, Kristin)
August 30, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Attorney General William Barr re #2 Complaint,, by Plaintiffs M.S.1, Norah Savard. (Knudson, Kristin)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 8/30/2019. Consent Form due by 10/16/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 10/30/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. (tsher, )
August 29, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (rsams, ) Modified on 8/29/2019 to correct docket text(rsams, ).
August 28, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry. (rsams, )
August 28, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6867379)Attorney Kristin A. Knudson added to party Meghan Savard(pty:pla), Attorney Kristin A. Knudson added to party Norah Elizabeth Savard(pty:pla), filed by Meghan Savard, Norah Elizabeth Savard. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Complaint, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to Complaint, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4 to Complaint, #6 Summons Cuccinelli, USCIS, #7 Summons McAleenan, DHS, #8 Summons Dunn, U.S. Attorney for CO)(Knudson, Kristin)
August 28, 2019 Filing 1 Administrative Notice: No initiating document. Attorney contacted with instructions to file the initiating document within 24 hours. (Text Only Entry) (rsams, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Savard et al v. McAleenan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Ian J. Kellogg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Act DHS Sec. Kevin MCALEENAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Director Kenneth Cuccinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meghan Savard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Cuccinelli
Represented By: Ian J. Kellogg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin McAleenan
Represented By: Ian J. Kellogg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Ian J. Kellogg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ms. Norah Elizabeth Savard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norah Savard
Represented By: Kristin A. Knudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?