Bigelow v. Smith
Plaintiff: Todd Bigelow
Defendant: Grit Post, LLC and Shara Smith
Case Number: 1:2019cv02433
Filed: August 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Kristen L Mix
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2019 Filing 10 ADVISORY NOTICE TO ATTORNEY AND COURT: Under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3(a), RICHARD LIEBOWITZ was administratively removed from the court's attorney roll and barred from filing electronically under CM/ECF for failing to pay the 2018 Biennial Fee. Counsel must complete a Bar/ECF application through counsel's Attorney Services Portal account and pay the full application fee to be restored to the attorney roll and CM/ECF. Upon reinstatement, counsel must file a Notice of Entry of Appearance in this case. (Text Only Entry) (mfred)
September 10, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Shara Smith, filed by Todd Bigelow. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Liebowitz, Richard)
September 4, 2019 Filing 8 Utility Setting/Resetting Deadlines/Hearings: Text Only Entry Proposed Scheduling Order due on or before 11/5/2019 pursuant to #6 Order. (nmarb, )
September 4, 2019 Filing 7 Utility Setting/Resetting Deadlines/Hearings: DUPLICATIVE OF ENTRY 8 Text Only Entry Proposed Scheduling Order due on or before 11/5/2019, pursuant to #6 Order. (nmarb, ) Modified on 9/10/2019 to show as duplicative. (nmarb, ).
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 11/12/2019 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 9/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Continuation of Main Document, #2 Continuation of Main Document) (jgonz, )
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER. Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(c)(4), the deadline to file the Consent/Non-Consent to United States Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form [#4-1] is October 29, 2019. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 9/4/2019. Text Only Entry (klmlc1, )
August 28, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (cmadr, )
August 27, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry (cmadr, )
August 27, 2019 Filing 2 Report re Copyright: Report on the filing of an action emailed separately to the Director of the Copyright Office. (cmadr, )
August 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Grit Post, LLC (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6866313)Attorney Richard Liebowitz added to party Todd Bigelow(pty:pla), filed by Todd Bigelow. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Copyright Form)(Liebowitz, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bigelow v. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grit Post, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shara Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd Bigelow
Represented By: Richard Liebowitz
Represented By: Richard P. Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?