Lopez et al v. Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The
Plaintiff: Debbie Lopez and Daniel Lopez
Defendant: Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The
Case Number: 1:2019cv02456
Filed: August 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: S Kato Crews
Referring Judge: Daniel D Domenico
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 10/10/19. (amont, )
October 10, 2019 Filing 17 COURTROOM MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews: Scheduling Conference held on 10/10/2019. Discovery due by 5/8/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 6/5/2020. Joint Status Report due by 12/20/2019. FTR: Courtroom C-201. (amont, )
October 3, 2019 Filing 16 Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiffs Daniel Lopez, Debbie Lopez. (Sar, Jonathan)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Crews. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions, and (5) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on September 16, 2019. Text Only Entry (dddlc2)
September 16, 2019 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE, by Senior Judge Lewis T. Babcock. Case returned to Judge Daniel D. Domenico for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-2456-DDD (angar, )
September 13, 2019 Filing 13 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #12 Consent/Non-Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-02456-LTB. (Text Only Entry) (jgonz, )
September 12, 2019 Filing 12 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The All parties do not consent.. (Walls, William)
September 5, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #2 Complaint , Separate and Affirmative Defenses, and Jury Demand by Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The.(Walls, William)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER Setting Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference set for 10/10/2019 11:30 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. The parties shall file their proposed scheduling order, and email a copy in Word format to Crews_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, on or before 10/3/2019. Consent Form due by 10/3/2019. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 9/5/19. Text Only Entry (amont, )
September 3, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Amy M. Samberg on behalf of Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, TheAttorney Amy M. Samberg added to party Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The(pty:dft) (Samberg, Amy)
September 2, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jonathan Shawn Sar on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Jonathan Shawn Sar added to party Daniel Lopez(pty:pla), Attorney Jonathan Shawn Sar added to party Debbie Lopez(pty:pla) (Sar, Jonathan)
September 2, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Sean Bradley Leventhal on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Sean Bradley Leventhal added to party Daniel Lopez(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Bradley Leventhal added to party Debbie Lopez(pty:pla) (Leventhal, Sean)
August 29, 2019 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (cmadr, )
August 29, 2019 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
August 29, 2019 Filing 4 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (cmadr, )
August 29, 2019 Filing 3 RETURN of Service of Summons, Complaint upon Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company on 8 August, 2019 (cmadr, )
August 29, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT for Damages and Jury Demand against Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The, filed by Daniel Lopez, Debbie Lopez.(cmadr, )
August 29, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, a Connecticut corporation from Arapahoe County District Court, Case Number 2019CV31765. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-6868836), filed by The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, a Connecticut corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A-Complaint, #2 Exhibit Ex. B-Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Ex. C-Register of Actions, #4 Exhibit Ex. D-Return of Service, #5 Exhibit Ex. E-Delay Reduction Order, #6 Exhibit Ex. F-Summons, #7 Exhibit Ex. G-Certificate of Good Standing, #8 Exhibit Ex. H-Notice of Removal State, #9 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet-Federal)(Walls, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lopez et al v. Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debbie Lopez
Represented By: Jonathan Shawn Sar
Represented By: Sean Bradley Leventhal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Lopez
Represented By: Jonathan Shawn Sar
Represented By: Sean Bradley Leventhal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The
Represented By: William Ryan Walls
Represented By: Amy M. Samberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?