Shrestha et al v. McAleenan et al
Plaintiff: Saroj Shrestha and Sushma Sherestha
Defendant: Angela K. Goldfinger, Andrew Lambrecht, Kenneth Cuccinelli, Kathy Baran, Donald Neufeld and Kevin McAleenan
Case Number: 1:2019cv02458
Filed: August 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Robert E Blackburn
Referring Judge: Kristen L Mix
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER. Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(c)(4), the deadline to file the Consent/Non-Consent to United States Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form [#6] is November 26, 2019. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 10/9/2019. Text Only Entry (klmlc2, )
September 18, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant(s) Kathy Baran served on 9/11/2019, answer due 11/12/2019; Kenneth Cuccinelli served on 9/11/2019, answer due 11/12/2019; Angela K. Goldfinger served on 9/11/2019, answer due 11/12/2019; Andrew Lambrecht served on 9/11/2019, answer due 11/12/2019; Kevin McAleenan served on 9/11/2019, answer due 11/12/2019; Donald Neufeld served on 9/11/2019, answer due 11/12/2019. (Casey, Jennifer)
September 3, 2019 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (agarc, )
September 3, 2019 Filing 5 CASE REASSIGNED. This case was drawn to the AP Docket in error and has been randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-02458-KLM. (Text Only Entry) (agarc, )
August 29, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (cmadr, )
August 29, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (cmadr, )
August 29, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
August 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against KATHY A. BARAN, Kenneth CUCCINELLI, ANGELA Kristi GOLDINGER, ANDREW LAMBRECHT, Kevin MCALEENAN, DONALD NEUFELD (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6869234)Attorney Jennifer Rilen Casey added to party Saroj SHRESTHA(pty:pla), Attorney Jennifer Rilen Casey added to party Sushma SHRESTHA(pty:pla), filed by Sushma SHRESTHA, Saroj SHRESTHA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Action Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Summons McAleenan, #18 Summons Cuccinelli, #19 Summons Neufeld, #20 Summons Baran, #21 Summons Goldinger, #22 Summons Lambrecht, #23 Summons Barr, #24 Summons Dunn)(Casey, Jennifer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shrestha et al v. McAleenan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angela K. Goldfinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Lambrecht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Cuccinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathy Baran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Neufeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin McAleenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Saroj Shrestha
Represented By: David Lawrence Kolko
Represented By: Jennifer Rilen Casey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sushma Sherestha
Represented By: David Lawrence Kolko
Represented By: Jennifer Rilen Casey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?