USA v. All Funds Held in Wells Fargo Bank Account #1442712798
Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: All Funds Held in Wells Fargo Bank Account #1442712798
Claimant: Regional Home Health Care Systems, LLC East
Case Number: 1:2019cv02500
Filed: September 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: William J Martinez
Referring Judge: Kristen L Mix
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 18:0981
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Granting The Government's Motion to Consolidate Related Cases. The following cases are CONSOLIDATED: Civil Action No. 18-cv-3208-WJM-KLM and 19- cv-2500-NRN. Civil Action No. 18-cv-3208-WJM-KLM shall be the lead case and all future filings shall be made in this action. ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 10/17/2019. See Lead case 18-cv-3208-WJM-KLM (angar, ) Modified on 10/17/2019 to add text (angar, ).
September 25, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Attorney Richard Anthony Rice, Jr added to party Regional Home Health Care Systems, LLC East(pty:clm) by Regional Home Health Care Systems, LLC East.(Rice, Richard)
September 25, 2019 Filing 9 CLAIM by Claimant Regional Home Health Care Systems, LLC East. (Rice, Richard)
September 24, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Related Case by Plaintiff USA (Andrews, Tonya)
September 10, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Complaint for Forfeiture by Plaintiff USA (Andrews, Tonya)
September 4, 2019 Filing 6 WARRANT of For Arrest of Property In Rem issued. (tsher, )
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER FOR WARRANT for Arrest of Property In Rem, by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 9/4/2019. (tsher, )
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 9/4/2019. Consent Form due by 10/23/2019. Status Conference set for 11/6/2019 10:30 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. (tsher, )
September 4, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (rvill, )
September 3, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
September 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE IN REM against All Funds Held in Wells Fargo Bank Account #1442712798 Attorney Tonya Shotwell Andrews added to party USA(pty:pla), filed by USA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only), #2 Warrant for Arrest of Property, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Andrews, Tonya)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. All Funds Held in Wells Fargo Bank Account #1442712798
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All Funds Held in Wells Fargo Bank Account #1442712798
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Tonya Shotwell Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Regional Home Health Care Systems, LLC East
Represented By: Richard Anthony Rice, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?