McDaniel v. Office Depot, Inc.
Plaintiff: Ernestine McDaniel
Defendant: Office Depot, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv02529
Filed: September 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: S Kato Crews
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Setting Dismissal Paper Deadline and Vacating Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference. The parties have indicated that they have reached a settlement in this matter. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED that the parties shall file their Dismissal Papers by 11/27/2019. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Scheduling Conference set for 11/4/2019 is VACATED. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 10/29/2019. Text Only Entry (skclc2)
October 28, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Settlement by Plaintiff Ernestine McDaniel (Aquino, Rufino)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Setting Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference. The Scheduling Conference is set for 11/4/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. The parties shall file their proposed scheduling order, and email a copy in Word format to Crews_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, on or before 10/28/2019. The Magistrate Judge Consent Form (ECF. #9 ) is due 10/28/2019. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 9/6/2019. Text Only Entry (skclc2)
September 5, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Rufino Jerome Aquino on behalf of Ernestine McDanielAttorney Rufino Jerome Aquino added to party Ernestine McDaniel(pty:pla) (Aquino, Rufino)
September 5, 2019 Filing 9 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (rvill, )
September 5, 2019 Filing 8 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
September 5, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER, Defenses, Affirmative Defenses, and Jury Demand to #6 Complaint by Office Depot, Inc.(rvill, )
September 5, 2019 Filing 6 COMPLAINT against Office Depot, Inc., filed by Ernestine McDaniel.(rvill, )
September 5, 2019 Filing 5 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (rvill, )
September 5, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (McClung, Larry)
September 5, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Carl Francis McEncroe on behalf of Office Depot, Inc.Attorney Carl Francis McEncroe added to party Office Depot, Inc.(pty:dft) (McEncroe, Carl)
September 5, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Katherine M.L. Pratt on behalf of Office Depot, Inc.Attorney Katherine M.L. Pratt added to party Office Depot, Inc.(pty:dft) (Pratt, Katherine)
September 5, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Office Depot, Inc. from Adams District Court, Case Number 19CV31242. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-6879162), filed by Office Depot, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A - District Court Civil Cover Sheet and Complaint, #4 Exhibit B - Summons and Affidavit of Service, #5 Exhibit C - Office Depot SOS Information, #6 Exhibit D - Demand Letter, #7 Exhibit E - State Court Docket Sheet, #8 Exhibit F - Defendant's Answer and Jury Demand)(McClung, Larry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McDaniel v. Office Depot, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office Depot, Inc.
Represented By: Carl Francis McEncroe
Represented By: Larry S. McClung
Represented By: Katherine M.L. Pratt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernestine McDaniel
Represented By: Rufino Jerome Aquino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?