Allen v. Wootton
Plaintiff: Deborah Allen
Defendant: CARLEY WOOTTON
Intervenor Plaintiff: Pinnacol Assurance
Case Number: 1:2019cv02534
Filed: September 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Kristen L Mix
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2019 Filing 13 STATUS REPORT re Scheduling Conference by Plaintiff Deborah Allen. (Earl, Collin)
October 29, 2019 Filing 12 Unopposed INTERVENOR COMPLAINT against Carley Wooten, filed by Pinnacol Assurance. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Roundy, Bret)
October 11, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to substitute service on Defendant by serving insurance carrier by Plaintiff Deborah Allen. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Motion for Sub Service, #2 Affidavit Affidavit of Non Service)(Earl, Collin)
September 20, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Intervene by Intervenor Plaintiff Pinnacol Assurance. (Roundy, Bret)
September 20, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Bret J. Roundy on behalf of Pinnacol AssuranceAttorney Bret J. Roundy added to party Pinnacol Assurance(pty:intvp) (Roundy, Bret)
September 19, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Collin Joseph Earl on behalf of Deborah Allen (Earl, Collin)
September 18, 2019 Filing 7 ADVISORY NOTICE TO ATTORNEY AND COURT: Under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3(a), COLLIN JOSEPH EARL was administratively removed from the court's attorney roll and barred from filing electronically under CM/ECF for failing to pay the 2018 Biennial Fee. Counsel must complete a Bar/ECF application through counsel's Attorney Services Portal account and pay the full application fee to be restored to the attorney roll and CM/ECF. Upon reinstatement, counsel must file a Notice of Entry of Appearance in this case. (Text Only Entry) (mfred)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 9/12/19 Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 11/7/2019. Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 11/14/2019 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2, #3 Attachment 3) (nmarb, )
September 10, 2019 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (sphil, )
September 10, 2019 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Judge Robert E. Blackburn. This case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-02534-KLM. (sphil, )
September 6, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (rsams, )
September 5, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry. (rsams, )
September 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CARLEY WOOTTON (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6880016)Attorney Collin Joseph Earl added to party Deborah Allen(pty:pla), filed by Deborah Allen. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons WOOTTON)(Earl, Collin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allen v. Wootton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARLEY WOOTTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Allen
Represented By: Collin Joseph Earl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Pinnacol Assurance
Represented By: Bret J. Roundy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?