Handson Equine, LLC v. Pat Your Pet
Plaintiff: Handson Gloves and Handson Equine, LLC
Defendant: Pat Your Pet
Case Number: 1:2019cv02570
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Daniel D Domenico
Referring Judge: Michael E Hegarty
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:0101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER granting #9 Motion to Continue Scheduling Conference by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/29/2019. Proposed Scheduling Order due 12/24/2019. Scheduling Conference is VACATED and RESET to 1/7/2020 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty.(tsher, )
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #9 MOTION to Vacate Scheduling Conference filed by Handson Equine, LLC. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 10/29/2019. Text Only Entry (dddlc3, )
October 29, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Vacate Scheduling Conference by Plaintiff Handson Equine, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Walsworth, Ian)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 9/17/2019. Scheduling Conference is VACATED and RESET to 11/19/2019 01:30 PM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (tsher, )
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER Pursuant to the Order of Reference, it is hereby ORDERED that the Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) Scheduling Conference shall be held on November 5, 2019, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom A-501, on the fifth floor of the Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse located at 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado. ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 9/11/2019. (cthom, )
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions, and (5) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 9/11/2019. Text Only Entry (dddlc3, )
September 11, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Walsworth, Ian)
September 11, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (rvill, )
September 10, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Daniel D. Domenico and drawn to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
September 10, 2019 Filing 2 Report re Patent: Report on the filing of an action emailed (NEF) to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (rvill, )
September 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Pat Your Pet (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6887115)Attorney Ian Richard Walsworth added to party Handson Gloves(pty:pla), filed by Handson Gloves. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Summons)(Walsworth, Ian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Handson Equine, LLC v. Pat Your Pet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Handson Gloves
Represented By: Ian Richard Walsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Handson Equine, LLC
Represented By: Ian Richard Walsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pat Your Pet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?