Marechal v. Safeco Insurance Company of America
Plaintiff: Jean Pierre Marechal
Defendant: Safeco Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 1:2019cv02572
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Kristen L Mix
Referring Judge: Raymond P Moore
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2019 Filing 22 Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendant Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Bach, Chris)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATED 502(d) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 11/7/19.(nmarb, )
November 7, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Chris Bradley Bach on behalf of Safeco Insurance Company of AmericaAttorney Chris Bradley Bach added to party Safeco Insurance Company of America(pty:dft) (Bach, Chris)
November 7, 2019 Filing 19 PLEASE NOTE COURTROOM LOCATION CHANGE ONLY. The Scheduling Conference set for November 14, 2019 at 10:30 a.m. will be held at: 901 19th St., Courtroom A1002, Denver CO 80294 Text Only Entry (lgale, )
November 6, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Serving Rule 26 Disclosures to Defendant by Plaintiff Jean Pierre Marechal (Fadner, Derek)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEMORANDUM regarding #14 Stipulated MOTION for Order to Pursuant to F.R.E. 502(d) filed by Safeco Insurance Company of America. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Entered by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 11/5/2019. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
November 5, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Plaintiff Jean Pierre Marechal. (Fadner, Derek)
November 5, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Derek Lee Fadner on behalf of Jean Pierre MarechalAttorney Derek Lee Fadner added to party Jean Pierre Marechal(pty:pla) (Fadner, Derek)
November 4, 2019 Filing 14 Stipulated MOTION for Order to Pursuant to F.R.E. 502(d) by Defendant Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Spano, Brian)
October 31, 2019 Filing 13 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Safeco Insurance Company of America All parties do not consent.. (Spano, Brian)
September 26, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Holly C. White on behalf of Safeco Insurance Company of AmericaAttorney Holly C. White added to party Safeco Insurance Company of America(pty:dft) (White, Holly)
September 12, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #3 Complaint by Safeco Insurance Company of America.(Spano, Brian)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 9/12/19 Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 11/7/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 11/14/2019 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2, #3 Attachment 3) (nmarb, )
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER: With the assignment of this matter, the parties are advised that throughout this case they are expected to be familiar and comply with not only the Local Rules of this District, but also Judge Raymond P. Moore's Civil Practice Standards, which may be found at: http://www.cod.uscourts.gov/JudicialOfficers/ActiveArticleIIIJudges/HonRaymondPMoore.aspx. Entered by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 9/11/2019. Text Only Entry (cpear)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order, and (5) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. Entered by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 9/11/2019. Text Only Entry (cpear)
September 10, 2019 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (cmadr, )
September 10, 2019 Filing 6 Case assigned to Judge Raymond P. Moore and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry (cmadr, )
September 10, 2019 Filing 5 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (cmadr, )
September 10, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Service of Process of Summons, Complaint upon Safeco Insurance Company of America on 21 August, 2019 (cmadr, )
September 10, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Safeco Insurance Company of America, filed by Jean Pierre Marechal.(cmadr, )
September 10, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing of State Court Records by Defendant Safeco Insurance Company of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Notice of Filing of State Court Records)(Spano, Brian)
September 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Safeco Insurance Company of America from Arapahoe County District Court, Case Number 2019cv31453. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-6887224), filed by Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit B to Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit C to Notice of Removal, #4 Exhibit D to Notice of Removal, #5 Exhibit E to Notice of Removal, #6 Civil Cover Sheet to Notice of Removal)(Spano, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marechal v. Safeco Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeco Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Brian John Spano
Represented By: Holly C. White
Represented By: Chris Bradley Bach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jean Pierre Marechal
Represented By: Derek Lee Fadner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?