Permanent General Assurance Corporation of Ohio v. Fabrizio et al
Plaintiff: Permanent General Assurance Corporation of Ohio
Defendant: Paul Fabrizio, Justin Schwear, Camie Randall, Denver Transfer Group, Julienne Fabrizio and Gentle Hands Moving and Delivery
Case Number: 1:2019cv02573
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Lewis T Babcock
Referring Judge: Michael E Hegarty
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 11/8/2019. Proposed Scheduling Order due 11/21/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 12/12/2019 10:15 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (tsher, )
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER of reference to United States Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 11/8/2019. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-2573-LTB-MEH (angar, )
October 31, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Permanent General Assurance Corporation of Ohio. Denver Transfer Group served on 10/31/2019, answer due 11/21/2019. (Chaney, Lelia)
October 21, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, Attorney Chad Patrick Hemmat added to party Camie Randall(pty:dft) by Camie Randall.(Hemmat, Chad)
October 16, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Permanent General Assurance Corporation of Ohio. Justin Schwear served on 10/14/2019, answer due 11/4/2019. (Chaney, Lelia)
October 16, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Permanent General Assurance Corporation of Ohio. Paul Fabrizio served on 10/14/2019, answer due 11/4/2019. (Chaney, Lelia)
October 16, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Permanent General Assurance Corporation of Ohio. Julienne Fabrizio served on 10/14/2019, answer due 11/4/2019. (Chaney, Lelia)
October 1, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Permanent General Assurance Corporation of Ohio. Camie Randall served on 9/25/2019, answer due 10/16/2019. (Chaney, Lelia)
September 11, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (rvill, )
September 10, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock and drawn to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
September 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against Denver Transfer Group, Julienne Fabrizio, Paul Fabrizio, Camie Randall, Justin Schwear (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6887313)Attorney Lelia Kathleen Chaney added to party Permanent General Assurance Corporation of Ohio(pty:pla), filed by Permanent General Assurance Corporation of Ohio. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons Denver Transfer Group, #6 Summons Julienne Fabrizio, #7 Summons Paul Fabrizio, #8 Summons Camie Randall, #9 Summons Justin Schwear)(Chaney, Lelia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Permanent General Assurance Corporation of Ohio v. Fabrizio et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Fabrizio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Schwear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Camie Randall
Represented By: Chad Patrick Hemmat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denver Transfer Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julienne Fabrizio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gentle Hands Moving and Delivery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Permanent General Assurance Corporation of Ohio
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?